EP3889192 - POLYMERIC ADDITIVES MADE USING BASE ADDITION AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Office of General Counsel Intellectual Property Law Department Attn: IP Documentation Center 800 Phillips Road, MS 105-20C Webster, NY 14580 / US | [2024/29] |
Former [2021/40] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Office of General Counsel Intellectual Property Law Department Attn: IP Documentation Center 800 Phillips Road, MS 105-20C Webster, NY 14580 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VEREGIN, Richard P. N. 3218 Dover Crescent Mississauga, Ontario L5L 5T6 / CA | 02 /
NOSELLA, Kimberly D. 85 Anderson Court Ancaster, Ontario L9G 4Z7 / CA | 03 /
DUQUE, Rosa M. 23 Grouse Lane Brampton, Ontario L6Y5L1 / CA | 04 /
DAVIS, Melanie Lynn 73 Wood Street East Hamilton, Ontario L8L 3Y5 / CA | 05 /
KURCEBA, David R. 401 Crerar Drive Hamilton, Ontario L9A 5K3 / CA | 06 /
VONG, Cuong 45 Amanda St Hamilton, Ontario L9C3H5 / CA | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 20208771.4 | 19.11.2020 | [2021/40] | Priority number, date | US201916701312 | 03.12.2019 Original published format: US201916701312 | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3889192 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3889192 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/18, C08K3/22 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
C08F220/1806 (EP);
G01N33/442 (EP,US);
C08F2/28 (US);
C08F212/36 (US);
C08F220/18 (US);
C08F220/34 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L33/14 (EP);
C08F220/1806, C08F212/36, C08F220/34 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] |
Former [2021/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | UNTER VERWENDUNG VON BASENZUGABE HERGESTELLTE POLYMERADDITIVE UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2021/40] | English: | POLYMERIC ADDITIVES MADE USING BASE ADDITION AND RELATED METHODS | [2021/40] | French: | ADDITIFS POLYMÈRES FABRIQUÉS À L'AIDE DE L'ADDITION DE BASE ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2021/40] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 06.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US8663886 (VANBESIEN DARYL W [CA], et al); | [A]US2015010862 (MATSUMOTO YOSHIYASU [JP], et al); | [A]US2018181013 (CHIBA TAKERU [JP]); | [ADP]EP3715391 (XEROX CORP [US]) | by applicant | US8663886 |