EP4002417 - POWER DISTRIBUTION CONNECTION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Future Systems Besitz GmbH Mönchrödener Str. 10 96472 Rödental / DE | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINBERGER, Philipp 96450 Coburg / DE | 02 /
SPIEL, Peter 93049 Regensburg / DE | 03 /
BREHM, Florian 96472 Rödental / DE | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20209001.5 | 20.11.2020 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4002417 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/74, // H01H83/20, H02H3/10, H02H7/08, H02H7/22, H02P1/00 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
H01H71/74 (EP);
G06F21/81 (US);
G06F21/31 (US);
G06F3/04847 (US);
H02H3/04 (EP);
H02P29/027 (EP);
H01H2071/006 (EP);
H01H2071/7472 (EP);
H01H2300/03 (EP);
H01H2300/032 (EP);
H01H71/123 (EP);
H01H83/20 (EP);
H01H9/168 (EP);
H01H9/181 (EP);
H01H9/548 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANSCHLUSSGERÄT ZUR ENERGIEVERTEILUNG | [2022/21] | English: | POWER DISTRIBUTION CONNECTION APPARATUS | [2022/21] | French: | APPAREIL DE CONNEXION DE DISTRIBUTION D'ÉNERGIE | [2022/21] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/18] | 16.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4945443 (DEBIASI MARK S [US], et al); | [XI]US6289267 (ALEXANDER JAMES O [US], et al); | [XI]US2009206059 (KIKO FREDERICK J [US]); | [XI]KR20130001343 (LSIS CO LTD [KR]); | [XI]DE102014217292 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |