EP3923291 - SMART PROLOGUE FOR NONVOLATILE MEMORY PROGRAM OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel NDTM US LLC 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2024/34] |
Former [2021/50] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAVA, Pranav Folsom, CA 95630 / US | 02 /
MADRASWALA, Aliasgar Folsom, CA 95630 / US | 03 /
UPADHYAY, Sagar Folsom, CA 95630 / US | 04 /
VENKATARAMAIAH, Bhaskar Folsom, CA 95630 / US | [2021/50] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 20209470.2 | 24.11.2020 | [2021/50] | Priority number, date | US202016895890 | 08.06.2020 Original published format: US202016895890 | [2021/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3923291 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/10, G11C29/02 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
G11C16/10 (EP,US);
G11C16/34 (CN);
G11C16/3459 (US);
G11C16/08 (US);
G11C16/26 (US);
G11C16/30 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] |
Former [2021/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTER PROLOG FÜR DEN BETRIEB VON PROGRAMMEN MIT NICHTFLÜCHTIGEM SPEICHER | [2021/50] | English: | SMART PROLOGUE FOR NONVOLATILE MEMORY PROGRAM OPERATION | [2021/50] | French: | PROLOGUE INTELLIGENT POUR L'EXÉCUTION D'UN PROGRAMME DE MÉMOIRE NON VOLATILE | [2021/50] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 31.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011051521 (LEVY SHMUEL [IL], et al); | [X]US2011138111 (KIM MOO SUNG [KR], et al); | [XI]US2014104955 (KWAK DONG-HUN [KR], et al) |