EP3829065 - CAPACITIVE SENSOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING AN OBJECT GETTING CLOSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reime, Gerd Klotzbergstraße 60i 77815 Bühl / DE | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | RPK Patenanwälte Reinhardt und Kaufmann Partnerschaft mbB (Pforzheim) Grünstraße 1 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/22] | RPK Patentanwälte Reinhardt, Pohlmann und Kaufmann Partnerschaft mbB Grünstraße 1 75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 20209797.8 | 25.11.2020 | [2021/22] | Priority number, date | DE201910132508 | 29.11.2019 Original published format: DE102019132508 | [2021/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3829065 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/955 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
H03K17/955 (EP);
H03K2217/960735 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] |
Former [2021/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAPAZITIVE SENSOREINRICHTUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG EINER OBJEKTANNÄHERUNG | [2021/22] | English: | CAPACITIVE SENSOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING AN OBJECT GETTING CLOSER | [2021/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF CAPTEUR CAPACITIF AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UNE APPROCHE DE L'OBJET | [2021/22] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 24.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE102018117901 (REIME GERD [DE]) [AD] 1-16 * paragraph [0059]; figure - *; | [AD]WO2010012480 (REIME GERD [DE]) [AD] 1-16 * page 7, line 36 - page 8, line 35; figures 7, 8 *; | [A]CN201233588Y (SHENZHEN HEERTAI INTEL CONTROL [CN]) [A] 1-16 * page 4, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 7, line 7 - page 9, line 1 * * figure - * | by applicant | DE102018117901 | WO2010012480 |