EP3842260 - MOTORCYCLE TYRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOKIWA, Chihiro c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | 02 /
KOBORI, Shuji c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2021/26] | Application number, filing date | 20209963.6 | 26.11.2020 | [2021/26] | Priority number, date | JP20190236948 | 26.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019236948 | [2021/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3842260 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3842260 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/00, // B60C9/18 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
B60C9/0007 (EP,US);
B60C9/02 (CN);
B60C9/2006 (US);
B60C9/18 (CN);
B60C2009/0092 (US);
B60C2009/1828 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Title | German: | MOTORRADREIFEN | [2021/26] | English: | MOTORCYCLE TYRE | [2021/26] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE DE MOTOCYCLETTE | [2021/26] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 12.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | MC | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | LU | 26.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
LU | 26.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1983098 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7* paragraph [0032]; figures 1-6; claim 10 *; | [A]US2013168003 (NISHIMURA AKIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0032] , [0 36] , [0 37]; figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [A]EP3381714 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0016] , [0 17] , [0 33] , [0 34]; figures 1-4; claim 1 * | by applicant | JP2018167716 |