EP3827882 - MULTILAMELLAR COLLIMATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAP Sued GmbH Bahnhofstr. 4 90592 Schwarzenbruck / DE | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIEB, Klaus Gleiwitzerstr. 23b 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
UELTZHÖFFER, Stefan Bienenweg 3 92318 Neumarkt i. d. Opf. / DE | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [2021/22] | Application number, filing date | 20210005.3 | 26.11.2020 | [2021/22] | Priority number, date | DE201910132299 | 28.11.2019 Original published format: DE102019132299 | [2021/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3827882 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10, // A61B6/00 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
A61N5/1045 (EP);
A61B6/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] |
Former [2021/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTILAMELLENKOLLIMATOR | [2021/22] | English: | MULTILAMELLAR COLLIMATOR | [2021/22] | French: | COLLIMATEUR À LAMELLES MULTIPLES | [2021/22] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 18.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.01.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE202008014892U (ELECTRONIC THOMA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0028] - [0035] *; | [A]DE102012211816 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XDI]US8537373 (HUMPHREY MALCOLM [GB]) [XD] 1,14,15 * column 4, lines 9-46 * * figure 2 * * column 3, lines 19-22 * * column 1, lines 16-19 * [I] 2-13; | [XDI]GB2505524 (REFLEX IMAGING LTD [GB]) [XD] 1,14,15 * page 19, line 14 - page 22, line 2 * * figure 8 * [I] 2-13 | by applicant | US2007176126 | EP2085117 | US8537373 | GB2505524 | US2018035969 |