EP3827663 - KIT FOR MOUNTING A PLANTABLE WALL GARDEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, HR, RS | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wegenast, Klaus Turnseestrasse 2 79102 Freiburg / DE | For all designated states Richard Brink GmbH & Co. KG Görlitzer Strasse 1 33758 Schloss Holte-Stukenbrock / DE | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wegenast, Klaus Turnseestr. 2 79102 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
Brink, Stefan Görlitzer Straße 1 33758 Schloß Holte-Stukenbrock / DE | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Mertzlufft-Paufler, Cornelius, et al Maucher Jenkins Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Urachstraße 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [2021/22] | Application number, filing date | 20210082.2 | 26.11.2020 | [2021/22] | Priority number, date | DE201910132125 | 27.11.2019 Original published format: DE102019132125 | [2021/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3827663 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3827663 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/02 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
A01G9/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] |
Former [2021/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BAUSATZ ZUR MONTAGE EINES BEPFLANZBAREN WANDGARTENS | [2021/22] | English: | KIT FOR MOUNTING A PLANTABLE WALL GARDEN | [2021/22] | French: | JEU DE MONTAGE D'UN JARDIN MURAL POUVANT ÊTRE RECOUVERT DE PLANTES | [2021/22] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 26.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 27.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5383448U (UNKNOWN) [Y] 16 * paragraph [0002] *; | [Y]DE3717877 (EISEN UND PLASTVERARBEITUNG GM [DE]) [Y] 10-12,15 * figure 1 *; | [YA]DE202009009792U (WAGNER MARTIN [DE]) [Y] 27 * figures 2,3 * [A] 1; | [Y]EP2323473 (HELIX PFLANZEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 17,18* paragraph [0001]; figures 2,3 *; | [IDY]EP3225739 (WEGENAST KLAUS [DE]) [ID] 1-9,13,14,19-26,28-31 * figures 1-4 * [Y] 10-12,15-18,27 | Examination | AU534395B | by applicant | EP3225739 |