Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7309587B | Global Dossier | 18.07.2023 | B2 | JP2021084411 | 03.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019217085 | 29.11.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112873718 | Global Dossier | 01.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019217085 | 29.11.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3827961 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2022 | B1 | EP3827961 | 02.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019217085 | 29.11.2019 |