EP4005742 - LABEL APPLICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bizerba SE & Co. KG Wilhelm-Kraut-Straße 65 72336 Balingen / DE | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRIES, Markus 72488 Sigmaringen / DE | 02 /
REMPEL, Konstantin 49610 Quakenbrück / DE | 03 /
NAMSUK, Winai 71116 Gärtringen / DE | 04 /
SCHELLE, Christian 72511 Bingen / DE | 05 /
LAUER, Jonas 72458 Albstadt-Ebingen / DE | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutlingen / DE | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20210355.2 | 27.11.2020 | [2022/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4005742 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4005742 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/00, B25J13/08, B25J15/06, B25J17/02, B25J19/00 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
B25J9/0012 (EP);
B65C9/36 (US);
B25J13/088 (EP);
B25J15/0641 (EP);
B25J17/0275 (EP);
B25J19/0016 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | ETIKETTENAPPLIKATOR | [2022/22] | English: | LABEL APPLICATOR | [2022/22] | French: | APPLICATEUR D'ÉTIQUETTES | [2022/22] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 13.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 21.02.2024 | ES | 21.02.2024 | FI | 21.02.2024 | HR | 21.02.2024 | LT | 21.02.2024 | LV | 21.02.2024 | NL | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | SE | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | PT | 21.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
LV | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
PL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
PT | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 21.02.2024 | |
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05177572 (CANON DENSHI KK) [A] 6 * figures 1-7 *; | [Y]JPH05293783 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 6 * figure 2 *; | [Y]JP2001035862 (NEC YAMAGATA LTD) [Y] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [A]JP2004306179 (SHIBUYA KOGYO CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]CN104858867 (BONMET SHENZHEN ROBOTICS CO LTD) [A] 6,12,13* figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2016229066 (ILCH HARTMUT [DE]) [Y] 11-13 * figures 1-8 *; | [Y]DE102015223528 (KRONES AG [DE]) [Y] 9-11 * paragraph [0045]; figure 1 *; | [YD]DE102019103794 (FANUC CORP [JP]) [YD] 1-15 * figures 1-11 * | by applicant | EP2298510 | EP2651769 | DE102019103794 |