EP3838527 - PROTECTION DEVICE, SAWING MACHINE AND PROTECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/25] | PROTECTION DEVICE AND PROTECTION METHOD | ||
[2023/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otto Martin Maschinenbau GmbH & Co. KG Langenberger Strasse 6 87724 Ottobeuren / DE | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pietzsch, Stephan Bürgermeister-Dorn-Str. 1 87742 Dirlewang / DE | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | ERNICKE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Beim Glaspalast 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 20210535.9 | 30.11.2020 | [2021/25] | Priority number, date | DE201920107145U | 20.12.2019 Original published format: DE 202019107145 U | [2021/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3838527 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3838527 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B27G19/04, B27B5/26, B27G19/02, B27B5/24, B23D45/06 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
B27B5/243 (EP);
B23D45/068 (EP);
B27G19/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/05] |
Former [2021/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHUTZVORRICHTUNG, SÄGEMASCHINE UND SCHUTZVERFAHREN | [2023/13] | English: | PROTECTION DEVICE, SAWING MACHINE AND PROTECTION METHOD | [2023/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION, MACHINE DE SCIAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PROTECTION | [2023/13] |
Former [2021/25] | SCHUTZVORRICHTUNG UND SCHUTZVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2021/25] | PROTECTION DEVICE AND PROTECTION METHOD | ||
Former [2021/25] | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE PROTECTION | Examination procedure | 23.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/05] | 23.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 23.08.2023 | DK | 23.08.2023 | EE | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | MC | 23.08.2023 | NL | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SE | 23.08.2023 | SI | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | LU | 30.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | CZ | 23.08.2023 | |
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
MC | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
LU | 30.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 23.08.2023 | |
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
MC | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 23.08.2023 | |
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 23.08.2023 | |
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 23.08.2023 | |
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 23.08.2023 | |
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 23.08.2023 | |
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE20103373U (ALTENDORF WILHELM GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] * * figure 1 *; | [XDI]AT501316 (PANHANS MASCHB GMBH [AT]) [XD] 1-11,13-15 * page 4, paragraph 4 * * page 6, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 12; | [A]DE102006014647 (OTTO MARTIN MASCHB GMBH & CO K [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0028] - [0030] - [0039] * * figure - *; | [AD]EP2366515 (OTTO MARTIN MASCHB GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] ** figure - * | by applicant | AT501316 | EP1902822 | EP2366515 | FR2975624 | DE102016004255 |