EP4006456 - MILK STORAGE CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2023 [2023/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CERULLO, Alfredo 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VAN ROOSMALEN, Elisabeth Johanna 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
BROCKHUIS, Lili-Marjan 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
LIPSCH, Job 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
BARENDREGT, Nicole 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
DE VREEDE, Jasper 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 07 /
PAZOOKI, Amir Masoud Akbari 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20210703.3 | 30.11.2020 | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4006456 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F25C1/243, A61J9/00, // A61M1/06, B65D85/80 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
F25C1/243 (EP);
A61M1/062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MILCHVORRATSBEHÄLTER | [2022/22] | English: | MILK STORAGE CONTAINER | [2022/22] | French: | CONTENEUR DE STOCKAGE DU LAIT | [2022/22] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/19] | 22.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3306567 (FREI SR ARTHUR J) [X] 1,2,6,7 * figure 2 * [Y] 9,11; | [X]US4804083 (WEEKS PHILIP A [NZ]) [X] 1,6,10,14* figure 3 *; | [X]WO9623184 (BYRT CHARLES JOHN [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,8,10,12-14 * figures 1,3 *; | [X]US2011278430 (BARNO JONATHAN D [US]) [X] 1-4,8 * figure 1 *; | [XY]WO2016116858 (ANDROS S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8,10,12-15 * figures 1,2,5 * [Y] 9,11; | [X]WO2020104698 (ICEBREAKER NORDIC APS [DK]) [X] 1-5,8 * figure 13 * | by applicant | US2009088684 |