EP3806368 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING CONTROL INFORMATION AND DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Suckchel c/o LG Institute, 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Mingyu c/o LG Institute, 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 03 /
AHN, Joonkui c/o LG Institute, 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 04 /
SEO, Dongyoun c/o LG Institute, 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 20211102.7 | 16.06.2011 | [2021/15] | Priority number, date | US201035554410P | 16.06.2010 Original published format: US 35554410 P | US201036574710P | 19.07.2010 Original published format: US 36574710 P | US201037973710P | 03.09.2010 Original published format: US 37973710 P | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3806368 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3806368 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L1/16, H04L5/00, H04L27/26, H04B7/26 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
H04L5/0055 (EP,KR,US);
H04J11/0069 (KR);
H04L1/1671 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/1861 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0032 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0057 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/15] | H04L1/18, H04L5/00, H04L27/26, H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] |
Former [2021/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON STEUERUNGSINFORMATION UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2021/15] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING CONTROL INFORMATION AND DEVICE THEREFOR | [2021/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS DE COMMANDE ET DISPOSITIF CORRESPONDANT | [2021/15] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 18.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11795987.4 / EP2453605 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.06.2011 | AL | 16.03.2022 | AT | 16.03.2022 | CY | 16.03.2022 | CZ | 16.03.2022 | DK | 16.03.2022 | EE | 16.03.2022 | FI | 16.03.2022 | HR | 16.03.2022 | LT | 16.03.2022 | LV | 16.03.2022 | MC | 16.03.2022 | MK | 16.03.2022 | PL | 16.03.2022 | RO | 16.03.2022 | RS | 16.03.2022 | SE | 16.03.2022 | SI | 16.03.2022 | SK | 16.03.2022 | SM | 16.03.2022 | BG | 16.06.2022 | IE | 16.06.2022 | LU | 16.06.2022 | NO | 16.06.2022 | GR | 17.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | IS | 16.07.2022 | PT | 18.07.2022 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CY | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
MK | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
IE | 16.06.2022 | ||
LU | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CY | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
IE | 16.06.2022 | ||
LU | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
IE | 16.06.2022 | ||
LU | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
IE | 16.06.2022 | ||
LU | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
IE | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 16.03.2022 | |
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 16.03.2022 | |
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 16.03.2022 | |
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.03.2022 | |
NO | 16.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Physical layer procedures (Release 10)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.213, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110330), no. V10.1.0, pages 1 - 115, XP050476529 [XP] 1-16 * pages 91-107 * | [AP] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Further details of ACK/NACK selection method", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-104641 AN SELECTION MAPPING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100819), vol. RAN WG1, no. Madrid, Spain; 20100823, XP050450183 [AP] 1-16 * Section 2 * | [A] - PANASONIC, "Support of UL ACK/NACK channel selection for carrier aggregation", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-102856, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100504), vol. RAN WG1, no. Montreal, Canada; 20100510, XP050420006 [A] 1-16 * Section 2;; figure 5 * | [A] - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL, "DTX detection in case of simultaneous transmission of SR and ACK/NACK", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-081456, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080326), vol. RAN WG1, no. Shenzhen, China; 20080326, XP050109873 [A] 1-16 * Sections 2 and 3 * | [A] - "DRAFT3GPP TS 36.213 V8.7.0 (2009-05)", 3GPP DRAFT; DRAFT36213-870, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090602), XP050338736 [A] 1-8 * Chapter 10 * | [AP] - SAMSUNG, "UL HARQ-ACK Multiplexing: Mapping for 4 Bits", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-104577 A_N MUX MAPPING FOR 4 BITS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100817), vol. RAN WG1, no. Madrid, Spain; 20100823, XP050449873 [AP] 1-16 * Section 2 * |