EP3842466 - PRODUCT OF GLYCIDYL ETHER OF A MONO OR POLYHYDRIC PHENOL, EPOXY RESIN COMPOSITION, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PRODUCT OF GLYCIDYL ETHER OF A MONO OR POLYHYDRIC PHENOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chang Chun Plastics Co., Ltd. 7F., No. 301, Songjiang Rd. Zhongshan Dist. Taipei City 104 / TW | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUNG, Sung-Kuang 7F., No. 301, Songjiang Rd., Zhongshan Dist. 104 Taipei City / TW | 02 /
TU, An-Pang 7F., No. 301, Songjiang Rd., Zhongshan Dist. 104 Taipei City / TW | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/26] | Application number, filing date | 20211479.9 | 03.12.2020 | [2021/26] | Priority number, date | US201916726460 | 24.12.2019 Original published format: US201916726460 | [2021/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3842466 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/06, C08G59/50 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
C08G59/063 (EP,KR,US);
C07D303/02 (KR);
C07D303/23 (CN);
C07D301/28 (CN,US);
C07D301/02 (KR);
C07D303/24 (CN);
C07D303/27 (CN);
C08G59/20 (CN);
C08G59/245 (CN);
C08G59/3218 (CN);
C08G59/38 (CN);
C08G59/5026 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Title | German: | PRODUKT AUS GLYCIDYLETHER EINES EIN- ODER MEHRWERTIGEN PHENOLS, EPOXIDHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES PRODUKTS AUS GLYCIDYLETHER EINES EIN- ODER MEHRWERTIGEN PHENOLS | [2021/26] | English: | PRODUCT OF GLYCIDYL ETHER OF A MONO OR POLYHYDRIC PHENOL, EPOXY RESIN COMPOSITION, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PRODUCT OF GLYCIDYL ETHER OF A MONO OR POLYHYDRIC PHENOL | [2021/26] | French: | PRODUIT DE L'ETHER GLYCIDYLIQUE D'UN PHENOL MONO OU POLYHYDRIQUE, COMPOSITION DE RESINE EPOXY, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DU PRODUIT DE L'ETHER GLYCIDYLIQUE D'UN PHENOL MONO OU POLYHYDRIQUE | [2021/26] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 14.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US2943096 (REINKING NORMAN H) [YD] 7-15 * Examples * * Claims *; | [YD]US4284573 (ARNETT JOHN F, et al) [YD] 7-15 * Examples ** Claims *; | [XYI]US5409999 (MERVAL JEAN-PAUL [FR], et al) [X] 1-4 * example 1 * [Y] 7-15 [I] 5,6 | by applicant | US2943096 | GB897744 | US4284573 | JPS6079031 | EP0148817 | JPS6230145 | JPS6264817 | DE3635383 | US4876371 | JPH04353517 | US6001873 | JP2004262977 | US6984716 | JP2009051937 | US8426547 | JP2017155080 | CN108299165 | US10138325 | WO2018225411 |