EP3838462 - MACHINE REAMING TOOL, CUTTING INSERT AND BASE BODY FOR RECEIVING CUTTING INSERTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, ES, RO, SK | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states URMA AG WERKZEUGFABRIK Obermatt 3 5102 Rupperswil / CH | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZUMSTEG, Gilbert c/o Urma AG Werkzeugfabrik Obermatt 3 5102 Rupperswil / CH | 02 /
BERGER, Daniel c/o Urma AG Werkzeugfabrik Obermatt 3 5102 Rupperswil / CH | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Hagenholzstrasse 85 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Postfach 8032 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 20211515.0 | 03.12.2020 | [2021/25] | Priority number, date | CH20190001688 | 20.12.2019 Original published format: CH 16882019 | [2021/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3838462 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3838462 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3838462 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23D77/02, B23D77/00, B23D77/04 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
B23D77/025 (EP,US);
B23D77/044 (EP,CH,US);
B23C5/08 (CN);
B23B27/1655 (CH);
B23C5/2204 (CN);
B23C5/28 (CN);
B23D77/006 (EP,US);
B23B2200/165 (CH);
B23B2205/12 (CH);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] |
Former [2021/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MASCHINENREIBWERKZEUG, SCHNEIDEINSATZ UND GRUNDKÖRPER ZUR AUFNAHME VON SCHNEIDEINSÄTZEN | [2021/25] | English: | MACHINE REAMING TOOL, CUTTING INSERT AND BASE BODY FOR RECEIVING CUTTING INSERTS | [2021/25] | French: | ALÉSOIR MACHINE, INSERT DE COUPE ET CORPS DE BASE DESTINÉ À LA RÉCEPTION DES INSERTS DE COUPE | [2021/25] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 14.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 19.07.2023 | ES | 19.07.2023 | HR | 19.07.2023 | PL | 19.07.2023 | RO | 19.07.2023 | RS | 19.07.2023 | SK | 19.07.2023 | SM | 19.07.2023 | NO | 19.10.2023 | GR | 20.10.2023 | IS | 19.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 19.07.2023 | |
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 19.07.2023 | |
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 19.10.2023 | |
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 19.10.2023 | |
GR | 20.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]GB172796 (MILLER RALPH, et al) [X] 1,2,8,15 * page 4, line 60 - page 6, line 2; figures 1,3,5,7 * [A] 3-7,10-14 [I] 9; | [A]DE385524 (GEORG SAMUEL DIPL ING) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2278988 (GROENE WILLARD L) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XAI]US2517970 (BUCHANAN JOSHUA S) [X] 1-3,10,11,15 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 12; figures 1-6 * [A] 5-8,12-14 [I] 4,9; | [A]EP1750881 (MAPAL FAB PRAEZISION [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XAI]DE102007007399 (CBS PRAEZ SWERKZEUGE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,15 * paragraphs [0038] , [0043]; figure 5 * [A] 3-7,10-14 [I] 9 | by applicant | GB172796 | US2517970 | DE102007007399 |