EP3806379 - USER EQUIPMENT (UE) AND METHODS FOR COMMUNICATION USING DIRECTIONAL TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Qian One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
NIU, Huaning One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 03 /
WU, Geng One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Wardle, Callum Tarn Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | Wardle, Callum Tarn Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 20211609.1 | 14.12.2015 | [2021/15] | Priority number, date | US201562190049P | 08.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562190049 P | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3806379 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04B7/06 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
H04L5/0044 (EP,US);
H04B7/0617 (US);
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | BENUTZERGERÄTE (UE) UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMMUNIKATION MIT GERICHTETER ÜBERTRAGUNG UND GERICHTETEM EMPFANG | [2021/15] | English: | USER EQUIPMENT (UE) AND METHODS FOR COMMUNICATION USING DIRECTIONAL TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION | [2021/15] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT D'UTILISATEUR (EU) ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMUNICATION UTILISANT LA TRANSMISSION ET LA RÉCEPTION DIRECTIONNELLES | [2021/15] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 14.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15897892.4 / EP3320639 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013286960 (LI YING [US], et al); | [X]WO2014098542 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |