EP3831332 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DENTAL BOUNDARY DETERMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxilio Ltd 59 Griva Digeni Kaimakliotis Building, 5th Floor 6043 Larnaca / CY | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RASLAMBEKOV, Islam Khasanovich 11-39 49th Avenue, Apt. 1102 Long Island City, NY 11101 / US | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | BCF Global Centre d'Entreprise et d'Innovation 17-21, rue Saint-Fiacre 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/23] | BCF Global Centre d'Entreprise et d'Innovation 56, Bd Niels Bohr CS 52132 69603 Villeurbanne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 20212039.0 | 04.12.2020 | [2021/23] | Priority number, date | US201916703471 | 04.12.2019 Original published format: US201916703471 | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3831332 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61C7/00, G06T7/12 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
A61C7/002 (EP,US);
A61C9/004 (EP);
G06T17/20 (US);
G06T7/12 (EP);
G06T2207/10028 (EP);
G06T2207/20081 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ZAHNGRENZENBESTIMMUNG | [2021/23] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DENTAL BOUNDARY DETERMINATION | [2021/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE DÉTERMINATION DE LIMITE DENTAIRE | [2021/23] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 09.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/47] | 07.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005019732 (KAUFMANN MARKUS [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0197] * * figure - *; | [I]EP2258303 (ORAMETRIX INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0428] * * figure - *; | [A]WO2016128828 (ALIGN TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1,7* paragraph [00105] * |