EP4009078 - INLAND RIVER LIDAR NAVIGATION SYSTEM FOR VESSELS AND OPERATION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ship and Ocean Industries R&D center 14F., No.27, Sec. 2 Zhongzheng E. Rd. Tamsui 251 New Tapei City / TW | [2022/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSU, Ming-Hsiang 251 New Taipei City / TW | 02 /
LIAO, Chi-Min 251 New Taipei City / TW | 03 /
CHU, Chun-Han 251 New Taipei City / TW | [2022/23] | Representative(s) | Wittmann, Günther Patentanwaltskanzlei Wittmann Frans-Hals-Straße 31 81479 München / DE | [2022/23] | Application number, filing date | 20212063.0 | 04.12.2020 | [2022/23] | Priority number, date | TW20200142362 | 02.12.2020 Original published format: TW 109142362 | [2022/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4009078 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/89, G01S17/93, G01S7/51 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
G01S17/89 (EP,KR,US);
G01C21/3804 (KR);
G05D1/0206 (CN);
G01C21/203 (KR);
G01C21/3667 (KR);
G01S17/08 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] |
Former [2022/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BINNENFLUSS-LIDAR-NAVIGATIONSSYSTEM FÜR SCHIFFE UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/23] | English: | INLAND RIVER LIDAR NAVIGATION SYSTEM FOR VESSELS AND OPERATION METHOD THEREOF | [2022/23] | French: | SYSTÈME DE NAVIGATION LIDAR DE RIVIÈRE INTÉRIEURE POUR NAVIRES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2022/23] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 07.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.05.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2016125739 (STEWART PETER A [GB], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0085] , [0134] - [0143]; figures 5,6 *; | [I]US2020050893 (SURESH THIRU VIKRAM [US], et al) [I] 1-9* paragraphs [0065] , [0066] , [0101] - [0103] *; | [I]US2020057488 (JOHNSON MARK [FR], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0066] , [0076] , [0248]; figure 30 *; | [I] - WANG WEI ET AL, "Roboat: An Autonomous Surface Vehicle for Urban Waterways", 2019 IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS (IROS), IEEE, (20191103), doi:10.1109/IROS40897.2019.8968131, pages 6340 - 6347, XP033695749 [I] 1-9 * page 6343 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IROS40897.2019.8968131 | [I] - THOMPSON DAVID ET AL, "Efficient LiDAR-Based Object Segmentation and Mapping for Maritime Environments", IEEE JOURNAL OF OCEANIC ENGINEERING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, vol. 44, no. 2, doi:10.1109/JOE.2019.2898762, ISSN 0364-9059, (20190401), pages 352 - 362, (20190412), XP011718698 [I] 1-9 * pages 356,357; figures 6,7,10,11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JOE.2019.2898762 |