EP4012173 - A SYSTEM FOR A TOWER SEGMENT OF A TOWER, A RESPECTIVE TOWER SEGMENT, AND A WIND TURBINE HAVING A TOWER SEGMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Renovables España S.L. C/ Roc Boronat, 78 08005 Barcelona / ES | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voss, Stefan 48499 Salzbergen / DE | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 20212544.9 | 08.12.2020 | [2022/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4012173 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F03D13/10, F03D13/20 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
F03D13/10 (EP);
F03D13/20 (EP,CN,US);
F15D1/10 (US);
F03D17/00 (CN);
F03D80/00 (CN);
F05B2240/122 (EP,US);
F05B2240/912 (US);
F05B2260/96 (EP);
F05B2260/964 (US);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] |
Former [2022/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR EIN TURMSEGMENT EINES TURMS, ENTSPRECHENDES TURMSEGMENT UND EINE WINDTURBINE MIT EINEM TURMSEGMENT | [2022/24] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR A TOWER SEGMENT OF A TOWER, A RESPECTIVE TOWER SEGMENT, AND A WIND TURBINE HAVING A TOWER SEGMENT | [2022/24] | French: | SYSTÈME D'UN SEGMENT D'UNE TOUR, SEGMENT DE TOUR RESPECTIF, ET ÉOLIENNE DOTÉE D'UN SEGMENT DE TOUR | [2022/24] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 15.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP3029313 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [XI]CN206785562U (BEIJING GOLDWIND SCIENCE & CREATION WINDPOWER EQUIPMENT CO LTD); | [X]WO2018149527 (SIEMENS WIND POWER AS [DK]); | [X]CN211474341U (MING YANG SMART ENERGY GROUP CO LTD); |