EP3839432 - LASER RECEIVER AND TARGET WITH LIGHTED INDICATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK, SM | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trimble Inc. 935 Stewart Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAJMOUSA, Ayman Zuhdi 935 Stewart Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | 02 /
SNYDER, Chris William 935 Stewart Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | 03 /
UNGER, Eric Keith 935 Stewart Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [2023/48] |
Former [2021/25] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 20212562.1 | 08.12.2020 | [2021/25] | Priority number, date | US201916723512 | 20.12.2019 Original published format: US201916723512 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3839432 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3839432 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01C15/00, G01C15/06, G01S17/42, G01S17/88 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
G01C15/06 (EP);
G01C15/006 (US);
G01C15/002 (EP);
G01C9/24 (US);
G01S17/08 (US);
G01S17/88 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/25] | G01C15/06, G01C15/00, G01S17/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] |
Former [2021/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LASEREMPFÄNGER UND ZIEL MIT LEUCHTANZEIGEN | [2021/25] | English: | LASER RECEIVER AND TARGET WITH LIGHTED INDICATORS | [2021/25] | French: | RÉCEPTEUR LASER ET CIBLE AVEC INDICATEURS LUMINEUX | [2021/25] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 22.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012203502 (HAYES JAMES N [US], et al) [Y] 5,6* paragraphs [0326] - [0328]; figures 45-47 *; | [XAYI]US2018202805 (UNGER ERIC KEITH [US], et al) [X] 1,3,10,11,13,14 * paragraphs [0243] - [0263]; figures 22-25 * [A] 2,9 [Y] 5,6 [I] 4,7,8,12,15 | by applicant | US5313409 | US5486690 | US6133991 | US6175328 | US7012237 | US8087176 | US8943701 | US9880022 |