EP4011718 - BRAKE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2024/23] |
Former [2022/24] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balázs, Liktor 1096 Budapest / HU | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2024/23] |
Former [2022/24] | Schmid, Nils T.F. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20212845.0 | 09.12.2020 | [2022/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4011718 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4011718 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60T1/04, B60T17/22, B61H1/00, B61H13/36, // F16D66/02 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
B60T1/04 (EP);
B61H1/00 (EP,US);
B60T17/228 (EP,US);
B61H13/20 (US);
B61H13/36 (EP);
B61H15/0028 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/24] | B60T1/04, B60T17/22, B61H1/00, // F16D66/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] |
Former [2022/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BREMSANORDNUNG | [2022/24] | English: | BRAKE ASSEMBLY | [2022/24] | French: | ENSEMBLE FREIN | [2022/24] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 15.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4546298 (WICKHAM DAVID J [GB], et al); | [A]US2007152107 (LEFEBVRE WILLIAM [US], et al); | [AD]WO2019202032 (OVINTO CVBA [BE]); | [A]EP3587204 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) | by applicant | WO2019202032 | EP3608184 |