EP3825403 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR MODULATING APOLIPOPROTEIN(A) EXPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ionis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2855 Gazelle Court Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROOKE, Rosanne, M. 2855 Gazelle Ct. Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | 02 /
GRAHAM, Mark, J. 2855 Gazelle Ct. Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | 03 /
FREIER, Susan, M. 2855 Gazelle Ct. Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Leitner, Laura Novartis Pharma AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2021/21] | Larbig, Karen Dorothee Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 20212913.6 | 23.05.2013 | [2021/21] | Priority number, date | US201261651539P | 24.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261651539 P | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3825403 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3825403 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61P3/00, A61P9/00, A61P9/10, A61P29/00 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C07H21/00 (IL,KR,RU);
A61K31/7115 (IL,KR,RU);
A61K31/7125 (IL,KR,RU);
A61K48/00 (IL,KR,RU);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL);
A61P3/00 (EP,IL,RU);
A61P39/00 (IL,RU);
A61P9/00 (EP,IL,RU);
A61P9/10 (EP,IL,RU);
C07H21/02 (IL,KR,RU);
C07H21/04 (IL,KR,RU);
C12N15/00 (IL,KR,RU);
C12Y304/21007 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C12N2310/32 (IL,RU,US);
C12N2310/321 (IL,US);
C12N2310/3231 (IL,US);
C12N2310/3341 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C12N2310/34 (IL,US);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/341, C12N2310/3525 (US,EP);
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3525 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] |
Former [2021/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR MODULATION DER APOLIPOPROTEIN(A)-EXPRESSION | [2021/21] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR MODULATING APOLIPOPROTEIN(A) EXPRESSION | [2021/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS DE MODULATION DE L'EXPRESSION DE L'APOLIPOPROTÉINE(A) | [2021/21] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 09.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13793955.9 / EP2855500 | EP20180985.2 / EP3822352 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]WO2005000201 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [XD] 7-18,20-23 * pages 39, 49ff; examples 20, 23; claims 1-28, 32-49; tables 4, 7; sequences 11, 13, 16, 89 * * the whole document * [I] 1-20; | [XDI] - ESTHER MERKI ET AL, "Antisense Oligonucleotide Lowers Plasma Levels of Apolipoprotein (a) and Lipoprotein (a) in Transgenic Mice", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF CARDIOLOGY, ELSEVIER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 57, no. 15, doi:10.1016/J.JACC.2010.10.052, ISSN 0735-1097, (20101018), pages 1611 - 1621, (20110226), XP028407468 [XD] 7-18,20 * the whole document * [I] 1-23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jacc.2010.10.052 | [A] - GIUSEPPE LIPPI ET AL, "Antisense therapy in the treatment of hypercholesterolemia", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 22, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.EJIM.2011.06.015, ISSN 0953-6205, (20110629), pages 541 - 546, (20110712), XP028105485 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejim.2011.06.015 | by applicant | WO9414226 | WO9839352 | US5877022 | WO9914226 | US6268490 | WO03004602 | WO03014397 | US6525191 | US6670461 | US6770748 | US2004171570 | US6794499 | WO2004106356 | WO2005000201 | WO2005021570 | US2005130923 | US7034133 | US7053207 | WO2007134181 | US2008039618 | US7399845 | WO2008101157 | US7427672 | WO2008150729 | WO2008154401 | WO2009006478 | US2009012281 | US7547684 | US7696345 | US8138328 | - KRAFT et al., Eur J Hum Genet, (19960000), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 74 - 87 | - SCHULTZ et al., PLoS One, (20100000), vol. 5, page el4328 | - BERGMARK et al., J Lipid Res, (20080000), vol. 49, pages 2230 - 2239 | - TSIMIKAS et al., Circulation, (20090000), vol. 119, no. 13, pages 1711 - 1719 | - KOSCHINSKYMARCOVINA, Curr Opin Lipidol, (20040000), vol. 15, pages 167 - 174 | - RIFAI et al., Clin Chem, (20040000), vol. 50, pages 1364 - 71 | - ERQOU et al., JAMA, (20090000), vol. 302, pages 412 - 23 | - KAMSTRUP et al., Circulation, (20080000), vol. 117, pages 176 - 84 | - CLARKE et al., NEJM, vol. 2009, no. 361, pages 2518 - 2528 | - SOLFRIZZI et al., J Neurol Neurosurg Psychiatry, (20020000), vol. 72, pages 732 - 736 | - MERKI et al., JAm Coll Cardiol, (20110000), vol. 57, pages 1611 - 1621 | - Arch. Int. Med., (19880000), vol. 148, pages 36 - 39 | - FREDRICKSONLEE, Circulation, (19650000), vol. 31, pages 321 - 327 | - FREDRICKSON et al., New Eng J Med, (19670000), vol. 276, no. 1, pages 34 - 42 | - YUAN et al., CMAJ, (20070000), vol. 176, pages 1113 - 1120 | - JAMA, (20010000), vol. 285, pages 2486 - 2497 | - LEUMANN, Bioorg. Med. Chem., (20020000), vol. 10, pages 841 - 854 | - WOOLF et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 7305 - 7309 | - GAUTSCHI et al., J. Natl. Cancer Inst., (20010300), vol. 93, pages 463 - 471 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. NT 025741.15 | - ELAYADI et al., Curr. Opinion Invest. Drugs, (20010000), vol. 2, pages 558 - 561 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, no. 403, page 410 | - ZHANGMADDEN, Genome Res., (19970000), vol. 7, no. 649, page 656 | - SMITHWATERMAN, Adv. Appl. Math., (19810000), vol. 2, no. 482, page 489 | - CHATTOPADHYAYA et al., J. Org. Chem., (20090000), vol. 74, pages 118 - 134 | - SINGH et al., Chem. Commun., (19980000), vol. 4, pages 455 - 456 | - KOSHKIN et al., Tetrahedron, (19980000), vol. 54, pages 3607 - 3630 | - WAHLESTEDT et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U. S. A., (20000000), vol. 97, pages 5633 - 5638 | - KUMAR et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (19980000), vol. 8, pages 2219 - 2222 | - SINGH et al., J. Org. Chem., (19980000), vol. 63, pages 10035 - 10039 | - SRIVASTAVA et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20070000), vol. 129, no. 26, pages 8362 - 8379 | - BRAASCH, Chem. Biol., (20010000), vol. 8, pages 1 - 7 | - ORUM et al., Curr. Opinion Mol. Ther., (20010000), vol. 3, pages 239 - 243 | - FRIEDEN, Nucleic Acids Research, (20030000), vol. 21, pages 6365 - 6372 | - FREIER et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19970000), vol. 25, no. 22, pages 4429 - 4443 | - ALBAEK et al., J. Org. Chem., (20060000), vol. 71, pages 7731 - 7740 | - BAKER et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19970000), vol. 272, pages 11944 - 12000 | - MARTIN, Helv. Chim. Acta, (19950000), vol. 78, pages 486 - 504 | - ALTMANN et al., Chimia, (19960000), vol. 50, pages 168 - 176 | - ALTMANN et al., Biochem. Soc. Trans., (19960000), vol. 24, pages 630 - 637 | - ALTMANN et al., Nucleosides Nucleotides, (19970000), vol. 16, pages 917 - 926 | - SANGHVI, Y.S.CROOKE, S.T.LEBLEU, B., edsAntisense Research and Applications, CRC Press, (19930000), pages 276 - 278 | - JONES, L.J. et al., Analytical Biochemistry, (19980000), vol. 265, pages 368 - 374 | - LIPPI et al., Clinica Chimica Acta, (20110000), vol. 412, pages 797 - 801 | - FRAZER, K.A. et al., Nat. Genet., (19950000), vol. 9, pages 424 - 431 | US19740609895 | US19950610269 | US19980610269 | US19640610565 | US19870610977 | US19440610998 | WO1998DK00393 |