blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3929820

EP3929820 - METHOD FOR TRAINING OBFUSCATION NETWORK WHICH CONCEALS ORIGINAL DATA TO BE USED FOR MACHINE LEARNING AND TRAINING SURROGATE NETWORK WHICH USES OBFUSCATED DATA GENERATED BY OBFUSCATION NETWORK AND LEARNING DEVICE USING THE SAME AND METHOD FOR TESTING TRAINED OBFUSCATION NETWORK AND TESTING DEVICE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.11.2021
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deeping Source Inc.
13-104, 518, Teheran-ro
Gangnam-gu
Seoul / KR
[2021/52]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Tae Hoon
Seoul / KR
 [2021/52]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [2021/52]AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date20213467.211.12.2020
[2021/52]
Priority number, dateUS20201691110624.06.2020         Original published format: US202016911106
[2021/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3929820
Date:29.12.2021
Language:EN
[2021/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.06.2021
ClassificationIPC:G06N3/04, G06N3/08, G06F21/14
[2021/52]
CPC:
G06N3/084 (EP,US); G06N20/00 (US); G06F21/14 (EP);
G06F21/6254 (EP,US); G06N3/045 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/31]
Former [2021/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM TRAINIEREN EINES VERSCHLEIERUNGSNETZWERKS, DAS DIE ORIGINALDATEN VERBIRGT, DIE FÜR DAS MASCHINENLERNEN ZU VERWENDEN SIND, UND ZUM TRAINIEREN EINES ERSATZNETZWERKS, DAS DIE DURCH DAS VERSCHLEIERUNGSNETZWERK ERZEUGTEN VERSCHLEIERUNGSDATEN VERWENDET, UND LERNVORRICHTUNG DAMIT, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM TESTEN DES TRAINIERTEN VERSCHLEIERUNGSNETZWERKS UND TESTVORRICHTUNG DAMIT[2021/52]
English:METHOD FOR TRAINING OBFUSCATION NETWORK WHICH CONCEALS ORIGINAL DATA TO BE USED FOR MACHINE LEARNING AND TRAINING SURROGATE NETWORK WHICH USES OBFUSCATED DATA GENERATED BY OBFUSCATION NETWORK AND LEARNING DEVICE USING THE SAME AND METHOD FOR TESTING TRAINED OBFUSCATION NETWORK AND TESTING DEVICE USING THE SAME[2021/52]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UN RÉSEAU D'OBSCURCISSEMENT QUI DISSIMULE LES DONNÉES ORIGINALES À UTILISER POUR L'APPRENTISSAGE MACHINE ET DE FORMATION D'UN RÉSEAU DE SUBSTITUTION QUI UTILISE LES DONNÉES OBSCURCIES GÉNÉRÉES PAR LE RÉSEAU D'OBSCURCISSEMENT ET DISPOSITIF D'APPRENTISSAGE L'UTILISANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE TEST DU RÉSEAU D'OBSCURCISSEMENT FORMÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'APPRENTISSAGE L'UTILISANT[2021/52]
Examination procedure11.12.2020Examination requested  [2021/52]
29.06.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2024Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2020034520  (KIM TAE HOON [KR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2020050962  (KIM TAE HOON [KR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *;
 [I]US10621378  (KIM TAE HOON [KR]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * claims 1, 4, 6, 8, 16 * * column 1, line 14 - line 15 * * column 2, line 29 - line 30 * * column 2, line 46 - line 61 * * column 17, line 1 - line 14 * * column 17, line 38 - line 41 * * column 19, line 54 - line 59 * * column 26, line 32 - line 44 * * column 27, line 3 - line 14 * * column 36, line 27 - line 45 * * column 39, line 13 - line 36 *;
 [A]US10621379  (KIM TAE HOON [KR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - TAE-HOON KIM ET AL, "Training with the Invisibles: Obfuscating Images to Share Safely for Learning Visual Recognition Models", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20190101), XP081010461 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantKR101861520B
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.