EP4011861 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DIARYL CARBONATES WITH LOW PHENOL CONTENT IN WASTE WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARSKA, Bernd 2040 Antwerpen / BE | 02 /
HEIJL, Jan 2040 Antwerpen / BE | 03 /
SLUYTS, Erik 2930 Brasschaat / BE | 04 /
YAO, Xiaoxin 201199 Shanghai / CN | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 20213498.7 | 11.12.2020 | [2022/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4011861 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07C68/02, C07C69/96, C08G64/30 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
C07C68/02 (EP);
C08G64/307 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C68/02, C07C69/96 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DIARYLCARBONATEN MIT GERINGEM PHENOLGEHALT IM ABWASSER | [2022/24] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DIARYL CARBONATES WITH LOW PHENOL CONTENT IN WASTE WATER | [2022/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE DIARYLCARBONATES À FAIBLE TENEUR EN PHÉNOL DANS LES EAUX USÉES | [2022/24] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/23] | 23.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]EP1216981 (BAYER AG [DE]) [ID] 1-6 * example -; claim - *; | [I]EP2272890 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]) [I] 1-6 * example -; claim - *; | [A] - Manfred Weber ET AL, "Phenol", Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, Weinheim, Wiley-VCH, (20200323), pages 1 - 20, doi:10.1002/14356007.a19_299.pub3, ISBN 978-3-527-30673-2, XP055694463 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/14356007.a19_299.pub3 | by applicant | US5340905P | US4016190 | EP0784048 | EP1216981 | EP1216982 | EP1219589 | WO2009071211 | - "Chemistry and Physics of Polycarbonates", H. SCHNELL, Polymer Reviews, John Wiley and Sons, Inc., (19640000), vol. 9 | - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science, (19690000), vol. 10 |