EP4011537 - PARTICLE POSITIONING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR POSITIONING PARTICLES USING THE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zivcec, Maria 9470 Buchs / CH | 02 /
Abu Antoun, Chafic 9470 Buchs / CH | 03 /
Kinkeldei, Thomas 80469 München / DE | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 20213658.6 | 14.12.2020 | [2022/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4011537 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23D61/18, B22F12/00, // B22F7/06, B22F5/00, C22C26/00 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
B24D18/0054 (EP);
B05D3/14 (EP);
B22F12/30 (EP);
B22F12/50 (EP);
B22F2005/001 (EP);
B22F2999/00 (EP);
B22F7/06 (EP);
B33Y30/00 (EP);
C22C26/00 (EP);
Y02P10/25 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F12/30, B22F2202/01 (EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F12/50, B22F2202/06 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM POSITIONIEREN VON PARTIKELN UND VERFAHREN ZUM POSITIONIEREN VON PARTIKELN MITTELS DER VORRICHTUNG | [2022/24] | English: | PARTICLE POSITIONING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR POSITIONING PARTICLES USING THE DEVICE | [2022/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POSITIONNEMENT DES PARTICULES ET PROCÉDÉ DE POSITIONNEMENT DES PARTICULES AU MOYEN DU DISPOSITIF | [2022/24] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/23] | 23.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4680199 (VONTELL JOHN H [US], et al) [A] 1-14* column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 24; figures 4-10 *; | [XI]US2001002283 (SUN HOI CHEONG STEVE [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-14 * paragraphs [0003] , [0011] , [0038] , [0039] , [0046] - [0048]; figure - * [I] 10; | [Y]US2010194012 (TATSUMI YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0032] , [0062] , [0063] , [0104] - [0110]; figure - *; | [YD]EP2409813 (HILTI AG [LI]) [YD] 1-14 * paragraphs [0004] - [0008]; figure - *; | [A]EP3338917 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0005]; figure - *; | [X]US2019240902 (BEDORET ALEXIS [BE], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0042] - [0047] - [0091] , [0227] - [0230]; figure - * | by applicant | EP2409813 |