EP3813225 - AC/DC POWER TOOLS WITH BRUSHLESS MOTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
White, Daniel J. 14432 Maple Ridge Ct. Baldwin, Maryland 21013 / US | 02 /
Velderman, Matthew J. 5101 Kenwood Avenue Baltimore, Maryland 21206 / US | 03 /
Varipatis, Michael 3232 Canterbury Lane Fallston, Maryland 21206 / US | 04 /
Vanko, John Charles 120 Springside Drive Timonium, Maryland 21093 / US | 05 /
Seman, Andrew E. 304 St. Mary's Road Pylesville, Maryland 21132 / US | 06 /
Roberts, Michael W Jr. 52 Kevin Drive York, Pennsylvania 17404 / US | 07 /
Osborne, Nathan J 3807 White Avenue Baltimore, Maryland 21206 / US | 08 /
Klee, Ryan 1307 Patspsco Street Baltimore, Maryland 21230 / US | 09 /
Irungu, Alfred 12 Parkhill Place Nottingham, Maryland 21236 / US | 10 /
Gottesman, Tal 29 Oakway Road Lutherville-Timonium, Maryland 21093 / US | 11 /
Gorti, Bhanuprasad V. 9004 Sunni Shade Court Perry Hall, Maryland 21128 / US | 12 /
Gilde, Philip 521 South Chapel Street Baltimore, Maryland 21231 / US | 13 /
Garibaldi, Nicholas c/o Stanley Black & Decker 701 East Joppa Road Towson, Maryland 21286 / US | 14 /
Friedman, Brian E. 2113 Bank Street Baltimore, Maryland 21231 / US | 15 /
Forster, Michael K. 19430 Vernon Road White Hall, Maryland 21161 / US | 16 /
Cox, John D. Stanley Black & Decker 701 East Joppa Road Towson, Maryland 21286 / US | 17 /
Fitzgerald, Daniel P. 60 Roger Valley Court Parkville, Maryland 21234 / US | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | SBD IPAdmin 270 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4DX / GB | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 20213840.0 | 18.05.2015 | [2021/17] | Priority number, date | US201461994953P | 18.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461994953 P | US201462000112P | 19.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462000112 P | US201462000307P | 19.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462000307 P | US201462046546P | 05.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462046546 P | US201462091134P | 12.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462091134 P | US201462093513P | 18.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462093513 P | US201562114645P | 11.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562114645 P | US201562118917P | 20.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562118917 P | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3813225 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/02 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
B25F5/02 (EP,US);
H02J7/0024 (EP,GB,US);
B25F5/00 (US);
H01M10/0445 (US);
H01M10/4207 (EP,US);
H01M10/425 (EP,US);
H01M50/213 (EP,GB,US);
H01M50/244 (EP,GB,US);
H01M50/247 (EP,GB,US);
H01M50/296 (EP,GB,US);
H01M50/588 (EP,GB,US);
H01M50/597 (EP,GB,US);
H02J5/00 (US);
H02J7/0013 (US);
H02J7/0029 (US);
H02J7/0045 (EP,US);
H02J7/007 (US);
H02J7/00714 (US);
H02J7/02 (EP,US);
H02J7/36 (EP,US);
H02P25/14 (EP,GB,US);
H02P27/08 (US);
H02P29/00 (US);
H02P29/024 (US);
H02P29/0241 (EP,US);
H02P29/032 (US);
H01M10/441 (EP,US);
H01M10/46 (EP,US);
H01M2220/30 (EP,US);
H02J7/00045 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] |
Former [2021/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AC/DC ELEKTROWERKZEUGE MIT BÜRSTENLOSEN MOTOREN | [2021/17] | English: | AC/DC POWER TOOLS WITH BRUSHLESS MOTORS | [2021/17] | French: | OUTILS ÉLECTRIQUES AC/DC À MOTEURS SANS BALAIS | [2021/17] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 26.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/14] | 19.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2022/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15795534.5 / EP3146615 | EP19218020.6 / EP3654488 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6104162 (SAINSBURY SIMON R [US], et al) [Y] 2,4-8,12,13 * figures 1,2 * * figures 4,5 * * column 4, line 42 - line 66 * * claim 1 *; | [Y]US2008284363 (LUCAS DELBERT E [US], et al) [Y] 2,5,6,10,13 * figure 28 * * paragraph [0131] - paragraph [0132] * * figure 46 * * page 89 *; | [A]US2009096399 (CHEN YUNG [US], et al) [A] 1-13* figure 1 *; | [XYI]WO2012127851 (HITACHI KOKI KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,9 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0047] * [Y] 2,4-8,10,12,13 [I] 11 | by applicant | US5986417 | US6538403 | US6975050 | US7497275 | US7821217 | US7834566 | US7928673 | US8446120 | US2013270934 | US8653787 | US8657031 |