EP3835553 - NON-METALLIC SIDE PLATE SEAL ASSEMBLY FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/24] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCAFFREY, Michael G. 150 Carriage Way Windsor, CT 06095 / US | [2023/46] |
Former [2021/24] | 01 /
McCAFFREY, Michael G. 150 Carriage Way Windsor, CT Connecticut 06095 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 20213949.9 | 14.12.2020 | [2021/24] | Priority number, date | US201916713284 | 13.12.2019 Original published format: US201916713284 | [2021/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3835553 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3835553 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3835553 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/00, F02C7/28, F01D5/30 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
F01D11/001 (EP,US);
F01D11/003 (EP);
F01D5/3015 (EP,US);
F05D2240/55 (EP,US);
F05D2240/80 (US);
F05D2260/36 (EP,US);
F05D2300/6033 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] |
Former [2021/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NICHTMETALLISCHE SEITENPLATTENDICHTUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN GASTURBINENMOTOR | [2021/24] | English: | NON-METALLIC SIDE PLATE SEAL ASSEMBLY FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE | [2021/24] | French: | ENSEMBLE JOINT DE PLAQUE LATÉRALE NON MÉTALLIQUE POUR UN MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ | [2021/24] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 03.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 10.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/43] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 10.05.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.05.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | IT | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | MC | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | LU | 14.12.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
IT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SK | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007297897 (TRAN TUY [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0023] ** figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US2010254807 (SMOKE JASON [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0034] * * figure - *; | [Y]EP2674577 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 7 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0028] * * figures 2-7 *; | [Y]WO2015112238 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0020] * * figure - * | Examination | EP2674577 |