EP4015032 - A STIMULATION GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 17.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capri Medical Limited 55 Lansdowne Park Ballsbridge Dublin D04 W2K0 / IE | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Assambo, Cédric Dublin, D04 W2K0 / IE | 02 /
Ring, Tim Dublin, D04 W2K0 / IE | 03 /
O'Keeffe, Mike Dublin, D04 W2K0 / IE | 04 /
Abbas, Farhat Dublin, D04 W2K0 / IE | 05 /
Mullins, John Dublin, D04 W2K0 / IE | 06 /
Ward, Fergal Dublin, D04 W2K0 / IE | 07 /
Usman, Muhammad Dublin, D04 W2K0 / IE | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF IP Limited Suite 415 The Guinness-Enterprise Centre (GEC) Taylor's Lane Dublin 8 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | HGF HGF IP Limited 43 Fitzwilliam Square West Dublin D02 K792 / IE | Application number, filing date | 20214017.4 | 15.12.2020 | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4015032 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36, A61N1/375 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
A61N1/36125 (EP,US);
A61N1/36146 (EP);
A61N1/36153 (EP,US);
A61N1/36157 (EP);
A61N1/36175 (EP,US);
A61N1/3756 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] |
Former [2022/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STIMULATIONSGENERATOR | [2022/25] | English: | A STIMULATION GENERATOR | [2022/25] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR DE STIMULATION | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 01.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.05.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016008602 (PERRYMAN LAURA TYLER [US], et al); | [A]US2018289965 (NELSON DWIGHT E [US], et al); | [A]US2020046974 (OSTROFF ALAN [US], et al); | [X]US2020061381 (GREINER JEFFREY H [US], et al); | [XI]WO2020227390 (MEDTRONIC SG LLC [US]) |