EP3838653 - VEHICLE CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kawasaki Motors, Ltd. 1-1, Kawasaki-cho Akashi-shi, Hyogo 673-8666 / JP | [2022/19] |
Former [2021/25] | For all designated states Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakayama, Kyotaro c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo, 650-8670 / JP | 02 /
Yanase, Daisuke c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo, 650-8670 / JP | 03 /
KAWAI, Daisuke c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chou-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo, 650-8670 / JP | 04 /
Tada, Tomoki c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo, 650-8670 / JP | [2023/13] |
Former [2021/25] | 01 /
Nakayama, Kyotaro KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo, 650-8670 / JP | ||
02 /
Yanase, Daisuke c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo, 650-8670 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWAI, Daisuke c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Higashikawasaki--cho 3-chome Chou-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo, 650-8670 / JP | |||
04 /
Tada, Tomoki c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo, 650-8670 / JP | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 20214282.4 | 15.12.2020 | [2021/25] | Priority number, date | JP20190227983 | 18.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019227983 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3838653 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3838653 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60L15/20, B60L50/15, B60L50/16 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
B60L15/20 (EP,CN);
B60W20/40 (CN);
B60W20/15 (US);
B60L50/15 (EP);
B60L50/16 (EP);
B60W10/06 (CN,US);
B60W10/08 (CN,US);
B60W40/105 (US);
B60W40/112 (US);
B62J45/20 (US);
H02P6/08 (US);
B60L2200/12 (EP);
B60L2270/145 (EP);
B60W2300/36 (US);
B60W2510/0638 (US);
B60W2510/0657 (US);
B60W2510/083 (US);
B60W2520/10 (US);
B60W2520/18 (US);
B60W2710/0666 (US);
B60W2710/083 (US);
H02P2205/05 (US);
Y02T10/62 (EP);
Y02T10/64 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSTEUERGERÄT | [2021/25] | English: | VEHICLE CONTROLLER | [2021/25] | French: | ORGANE DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE | [2021/25] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 13.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.03.2023 | CZ | 29.03.2023 | DK | 29.03.2023 | EE | 29.03.2023 | ES | 29.03.2023 | FI | 29.03.2023 | HR | 29.03.2023 | IT | 29.03.2023 | LT | 29.03.2023 | LV | 29.03.2023 | MC | 29.03.2023 | NL | 29.03.2023 | PL | 29.03.2023 | RO | 29.03.2023 | RS | 29.03.2023 | SE | 29.03.2023 | SI | 29.03.2023 | SK | 29.03.2023 | SM | 29.03.2023 | NO | 29.06.2023 | GR | 30.06.2023 | IS | 29.07.2023 | PT | 31.07.2023 | LU | 15.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 29.03.2023 | |
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 29.03.2023 | |
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 29.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2010134058 (NAGASHIMA JAMES M [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0031] * [A] 2-8; | [X]DE102014219769 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0009] *; | [A]DE102017209280 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-8* the whole document * | by applicant | JP2015077849 | JP2017140972 |