Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.02.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | |
26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.02.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.09.2023 | Change - applicant | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
30.12.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.12.2022 | Change - applicant | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] |
16.12.2022 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
16.12.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
14.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
26.08.2022 | Change - designated states | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
20.05.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
15.12.2020 | Change - representative |