EP3839816 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR IDENTIFYING AND MONITORING AT LEAST ONE TARGET, ASSOCIATED ELECTRONIC SYSTEM, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal | 03.10.2024 | Deletion: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bull SAS Rue Jean Jaurès 78340 Les Clayes-sous-Bois / FR | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARNAISE, Nicolas 24 rue Normandie Niemen 38130 ECHIROLLES / FR | 02 /
BOUKAMEL-DONNOU, Cécile 4 allée Eugène Sue 38130 ECHIROLLES / FR | 03 /
PELLETIER, Benoit 23 route du Crest 38960 SAINT ETIENNE DE CROSSEY / FR | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | IPAZ Bâtiment Platon Parc Les Algorithmes 91190 Saint-Aubin / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/25] | IPAZ Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon CS 70003 Saint-Aubin 91192 Gif-sur-Yvette Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 20214858.1 | 17.12.2020 | [2021/25] | Priority number, date | FR20190014599 | 17.12.2019 Original published format: FR 1914599 | [2021/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3839816 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06N3/02, G06T7/00, G06T7/73, H04N7/18, G06T7/292 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
H04N7/181 (EP,US);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06T7/292 (EP);
G06V10/255 (US);
G06V10/82 (US);
G06V20/52 (EP,US);
G06V40/20 (US);
G08B13/19608 (EP);
G08B29/185 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] |
Former [2021/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND ZUR NACHVERFOLGUNG MINDESTENS EINES ZIELS, ENTSPRECHENDES ELEKTRONISCHES SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2021/25] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR IDENTIFYING AND MONITORING AT LEAST ONE TARGET, ASSOCIATED ELECTRONIC SYSTEM, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2021/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE D'IDENTIFICATION ET DE SUIVI D'AU MOINS UNE CIBLE, SYSTÈME ÉLECTRONIQUE, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR ASSOCIÉS | [2021/25] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 30.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.05.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Appeal following examination | 05.07.2024 | Appeal received | 05.07.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 03.10.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2019294889 (SRIRAM PARTHASARATHY [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0099] , [0127] - [0133] - [0167] *; | [I] - PATRUNO COSIMO ET AL, "People re-identification using skeleton standard posture and color descriptors from RGB-D data", PATTERN RECOGNITION, (20190501), vol. 89, doi:10.1016/J.PATCOG.2019.01.003, ISSN 0031-3203, pages 77 - 90, XP085592700 [I] 1-10 * figures 1,6 * * page 78 - page 79 * * Sections 3.3 et 3.4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.patcog.2019.01.003 | [A] - SHEN YANTAO ET AL, "Learning Deep Neural Networks for Vehicle Re-ID with Visual-spatio-Temporal Path Proposals", 2017 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION (ICCV), IEEE, (20171022), doi:10.1109/ICCV.2017.210, pages 1918 - 1927, XP033283053 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * Sections 2 et 3.1.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2017.210 | [A] - NIKI MARTINEL ET AL, "Person Reidentification in a Distributed Camera Network Framework", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CYBERNETICS, Piscataway, NJ, USA, (20171101), vol. 47, no. 11, doi:10.1109/TCYB.2016.2568264, ISSN 2168-2267, pages 3530 - 3541, XP055513695 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * Section IV.1) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCYB.2016.2568264 | by applicant | US9111147 |