blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3854527

EP3854527 - PRECISION VICE FOR INDUSTRIAL USES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.06.2022
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  25.06.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2022Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.07.2022  [2022/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bo.Mec. Srl
Via G. Keplero, 6 Malo
36034 Vicenza / IT
[2021/30]
Inventor(s)01 / BORTOLOTTO, VALTER
VIA PONTE VECCHIO, 30/A
MALO
36034 VICENZA / IT
02 / BORTOLOTTO, DAVIDE
VIA PONTE VECCHIO, 30
MALO
36034 VICENZA / IT
 [2021/30]
Representative(s)Bettello, Pietro
Studio Tecnico Ing. Pietro Bettello
Via Col d'Echele, 25
36100 Vicenza / IT
[N/P]
Former [2021/30]Bettello, Pietro
Via Col d'Echele, 25
36100 Vicenza / IT
Application number, filing date20215162.717.12.2020
[2021/30]
Priority number, dateIT2020000110522.01.2020         Original published format: IT202000001105
[2021/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3854527
Date:28.07.2021
Language:EN
[2021/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.2021
ClassificationIPC:B25B1/02, B25B1/10, B25B1/24
[2021/30]
CPC:
B25B1/02 (EP); B25B1/10 (EP); B25B1/24 (EP);
B25B1/2489 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PRÄZISIONSSCHRAUBSTOCK FÜR INDUSTRIELLE ANWENDUNGEN[2021/30]
English:PRECISION VICE FOR INDUSTRIAL USES[2021/30]
French:ÉTAU DE PRÉCISION À USAGES INDUSTRIELS[2021/30]
Examination procedure29.01.2022Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2022/27]
18.02.2022Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2022/27]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE127733  (ADOLF METZGER) [A] 1-7 * page 1; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US1765826  (ANGELO DISIBIO) [A] 1-5 * page 1, line 45 - page 2, line 46; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2430366  (PORTERFIELD A T) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 50 - column 3, line 13; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2868091  (DU BOIS ARTHUR J) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 56 - column 4, line 27; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US3063707  (KELLEY CHARLES K) [A] 1-7* column 2, line 6 - column 4, line 38; figures 1,3-7 *;
 [Y]US4431174  (VARDEN ARNOLD [CA]) [Y] 1-7 * column 2, line 22 - column 4, line 37; figures 1-3 *;
 [YD]EP0526432  (CUTER SPA [IT]) [YD] 1-7 * column 2, line 27 - column 5, line 50; figures 1,2,4,5,7-10 *;
 [AD]CN108555788  (XU CHAOMING) [AD] 1-5 * abstract *
by applicantDE127733
 US1765826
 US2430366
 US2868091
 US3063707
 US4431174
 EP0526432
 CN108555788
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.