EP4015053 - A SYSTEM TO INTERFACE A PHYSICAL TRAINING DEVICE AND COMMERCIAL VIDEOGAMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETH Zurich Raemistrasse 101/ETH Transfer 8092 Zurich / CH | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUFE, Florian 8037 Zürich / CH | 02 /
XILOYANNIS, Michele 8057 Zürich / CH | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20215324.3 | 18.12.2020 | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4015053 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/212, A63F13/245, A63F13/428, A63F13/5255, A63F13/816, A63B24/00, G16H20/30 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
A63F13/212 (EP);
A63F13/245 (EP);
A63F13/428 (EP);
A63F13/5255 (EP);
A63F13/816 (EP);
G16H20/30 (EP);
A63B2024/009 (EP);
A63B2024/0093 (EP);
A63B2024/0096 (EP);
A63B2071/0655 (EP);
A63B21/00196 (EP);
A63B21/0058 (EP);
A63B21/0085 (EP);
A63B21/4025 (EP);
A63B2220/803 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SCHNITTSTELLE ZWISCHEN EINEM PHYSISCHEN ÜBUNGSGERÄT UND KOMMERZIELLEN VIDEOSPIELEN | [2022/25] | English: | A SYSTEM TO INTERFACE A PHYSICAL TRAINING DEVICE AND COMMERCIAL VIDEOGAMES | [2022/25] | French: | SYSTÈME PERMETTANT D'INTERFACER UN DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT PHYSIQUE ET DES JEUX VIDÉO COMMERCIAUX | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/23] | 20.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003125099 (BASSON SARA H [US], et al) [A] 1,9,14 * paragraphs [0014] - [0022] - [0025] , [0037] - [0043]; figures 1,2,6 *; | [A]US2008281633 (BURDEA GRIGORE [US], et al) [A] 1,9,14* paragraphs [0023] - [0026] - [0035]; figures 1,5 *; | [XY]WO2018148674 (UNIV DREXEL [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9-14 * paragraphs [0036] - [0045] - [0055] - [0058] * * paragraphs [0075] - [0076] - [0 90] - [0092] - [0110] * * paragraphs [0142] - [0144]; figure 11 * * paragraphs [0213] , [ 222] - [0231] * [Y] 6,8; | [Y] - PASQUAL THALES B ET AL, "Serious game development for Ankle rehabilitation aiming at user experience", 2016 6TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BIOMEDICAL ROBOTICS AND BIOMECHATRONICS (BIOROB), IEEE, (20160626), doi:10.1109/BIOROB.2016.7523762, pages 1007 - 1012, XP032930567 [Y] 6,8 * page 1008 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/BIOROB.2016.7523762 |