EP4016951 - COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED METHOD OF OPTIMIZING BANDWIDTH IN A PSAP ENVIRONMENT AND COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atos Public Safety LLC 4581 Regent Boulevard Irving, Texas / US | [2024/08] |
Former [2022/25] | For all designated states Unify Patente GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsiatsikas, Zisis Ano Toumpa 55534 Thessaloniki / GR | 02 /
Michopanou, Eirini P.C. 15122 Athens / GR | 03 /
Anagnostou, Sofia 14671 Nea Erythrea Athens / GR | 04 /
Karanasiou, Aikaterini 19400 Koropi Kropia, Attiki / GR | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies 2 rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Prinzregentenplatz 15 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20215566.9 | 18.12.2020 | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4016951 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L65/4061, H04L65/1069, H04L65/1076, H04L67/52 | [2024/41] | CPC: |
H04L65/1069 (EP);
H04W4/90 (US);
H04L65/1076 (EP);
H04L65/1104 (US);
H04L65/4061 (EP);
H04L67/52 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/25] | H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] |
Former [2022/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COMPUTERIMPLEMENTIERTES VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DER BANDBREITE IN EINER PSAP-UMGEBUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2022/25] | English: | COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED METHOD OF OPTIMIZING BANDWIDTH IN A PSAP ENVIRONMENT AND COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2022/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ INFORMATIQUE D'OPTIMISATION DE BANDE PASSANTE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT PSAP ET RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 07.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016337282 (KALLIO JUHA MATIAS [FI], et al); | [X]US2020274962 (MARTIN MICHAEL JOHN [US], et al) |