EP3843071 - PIXEL UNIT, DISPLAY PANEL AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Royole Technologies Co., Ltd Building 43 Dayun Software Town No. 8288 Longgang Road Henggang Street, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518172 / CN | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Shaowen c/o SHENZHEN ROYOLE TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Building 43, Dayun Software Town No. 8288 Longgang Road Henggang Street, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518172 / CN | 02 /
YUAN, Ze c/o SHENZHEN ROYOLE TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Building 43, Dayun Software Town No. 8288 Longgang Road Henggang Street, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518172 / CN | 03 /
KANG, Jiahao c/o SHENZHEN ROYOLE TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Building 43, Dayun Software Town No. 8288 Longgang Road Henggang Street, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518172 / CN | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2021/26] | Application number, filing date | 20216341.6 | 22.12.2020 | [2021/26] | Priority number, date | CN201911341157 | 23.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911341157 | [2021/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3843071 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/3225, G09G3/3233 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
G09G3/3225 (EP,CN);
G09G3/3258 (CN,US);
G09G3/3233 (EP);
G09G3/3266 (US);
G09G3/3291 (US);
G09G2300/0439 (US);
G09G2300/0819 (EP);
G09G2300/0842 (EP);
G09G2300/0861 (EP);
G09G2300/0866 (EP);
G09G2310/0262 (EP);
G09G2320/0233 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIXELEINHEIT, ANZEIGETAFEL UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/26] | English: | PIXEL UNIT, DISPLAY PANEL AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2021/26] | French: | UNITÉ DE PIXEL, PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2021/26] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 21.07.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2012001893 (JEONG JIN-TAE [KR], et al) [Y] 1-7,14,15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0091] * [A] 8-13; | [YA]US2019385520 (CHEN CAIQIN [CN]) [Y] 1-7,14,15 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0048] * [A] 8-13; | [Y]JP2004361737 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP) [Y] 1-7,14,15 * abstract *; | [YA]US2018006099 (KA JI HYUN [KR], et al) [Y] 1-7,14,15 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0102] * [A] 8-13; | [YA]US2015187270 (LEE SEUNG-KYU [KR], et al) [Y] 1-7,14,15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0140] * [A] 8-13 |