EP3828453 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO PIPELAYING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Subsea 7 Do Brasil Serviços Ltda. Rua Enegnheiro Fábio Goulart 155 Parte Ilha da Conceição 24050-090 Niterói - RJ / BR | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE LEMOS JÚNIOR, Luiz Carlos Rua Pirineus 123 Vila da Penha 20520-202 Rio de Janeiro RJ / BR | 02 /
CARVALHO GOUVEIA, João Carlos Avenida Julio Furtado 178/701 Grajau 20.561-018 Rio de Janeiro RJ / BR | 03 /
NICOLETTI DE FRAGA, Frederico Rua Dom Bosco, 83/301 - Icarai 24220-390 Niteroi RJ / BR | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Cummings, Sean Patrick Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2021/22] | Application number, filing date | 20216412.5 | 08.12.2017 | [2021/22] | Priority number, date | GB20160021012 | 09.12.2016 Original published format: GB 201621012 | [2021/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3828453 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3828453 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16L1/16, E21B43/01, F16L1/20, F16L1/26 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
F16L1/16 (EP,US);
F16L1/20 (EP,GB,US);
F16L1/12 (GB);
F16L1/26 (EP,US);
F16L41/021 (GB,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] |
Former [2021/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT ROHRVERLEGUNGEN | [2021/22] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO PIPELAYING | [2021/22] | French: | AMÉLIORATIONS CONCERNANT LA POSE DE PIPELINES | [2021/22] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 02.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17828834.6 / EP3551917 | Opposition(s) | 02.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.2023 | CZ | 28.06.2023 | DK | 28.06.2023 | EE | 28.06.2023 | ES | 28.06.2023 | FI | 28.06.2023 | HR | 28.06.2023 | LT | 28.06.2023 | LV | 28.06.2023 | MC | 28.06.2023 | NL | 28.06.2023 | PL | 28.06.2023 | RO | 28.06.2023 | RS | 28.06.2023 | SE | 28.06.2023 | SI | 28.06.2023 | SK | 28.06.2023 | SM | 28.06.2023 | GR | 29.09.2023 | IS | 28.10.2023 | PT | 30.10.2023 | LU | 08.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SI | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 28.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008038066 (RENARD DIDIER [FR], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 3, 5 *; | [X]US2014193205 (PARSINEJAD FARZAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figure 7a *; | [X]US2015337988 (HUANG ZHIMING [US], et al) [X] 1-3* figure 1 * | by applicant | US4133182 | US6435771 | WO2006054891 | WO2006089786 | WO2011110950 | WO2012101525 | WO2014135849 | WO2014207560 |