EP3842773 - MEASURE OF THE COLOR OF AN AREA OF INTEREST TARGET IN RELATIONSHIP WITH COLOR MEASUREMENT TARGETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cosnova GmbH Am Limespark 2 65843 Sulzbach / DE | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHELSKE, Yannik Thorsten Heiko Taunusstrasse 11D 65760 Eschborn / DE | 02 /
PRIORE, Gerardo Maria Saalgasse 2 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 03 /
MATHIEZ, Jean-Louis Marie Marcel 36 avenue de la gare 91470 Limours / FR | [2022/21] |
Former [2021/26] | 01 /
Thorsten Heiko Schelske, Yannik Taunusstrasse 11D 65760 ESCHBORN / DE | ||
02 /
Maria Priore, Gerardo Saalgasse 2 60311 FRANKFURT AM MAIN / DE | |||
03 /
MATHIEZ, Jean-Louis Marie Marcel 36 avenue de la gare 91470 LIMOURS / FR | Representative(s) | Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. C/o Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS 92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/26] | Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. c/o Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 20216513.0 | 22.12.2020 | [2021/26] | Priority number, date | FR20190015511 | 23.12.2019 Original published format: FR 1915511 | [2021/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3842773 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3842773 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3842773 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/02, G01J3/50, G01J3/52 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
G01J3/524 (EP);
G06T7/90 (US);
G01J3/0205 (EP);
G01J3/0264 (EP);
G01J3/0267 (EP);
G01J3/0272 (EP);
G01J3/0291 (EP);
G01J3/50 (EP);
G01J3/52 (EP);
G01J3/522 (EP);
H04M1/0264 (US);
H04N23/55 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] |
Former [2021/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MESSUNG DER FARBE EINES INTERESSIERENDEN ZIELBEREICHS IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT FARBMESSZIELEN | [2021/26] | English: | MEASURE OF THE COLOR OF AN AREA OF INTEREST TARGET IN RELATIONSHIP WITH COLOR MEASUREMENT TARGETS | [2021/26] | French: | MESURE DE LA COULEUR D'UNE CIBLE DE ZONE D'INTÉRÊT DANS UNE RELATION AVEC DES CIBLES DE MESURE DE COULEUR | [2021/26] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 24.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 25.05.2022 | CY | 25.05.2022 | DK | 25.05.2022 | EE | 25.05.2022 | FI | 25.05.2022 | HR | 25.05.2022 | LT | 25.05.2022 | LV | 25.05.2022 | MC | 25.05.2022 | MK | 25.05.2022 | MT | 25.05.2022 | RO | 25.05.2022 | RS | 25.05.2022 | SE | 25.05.2022 | SI | 25.05.2022 | SK | 25.05.2022 | SM | 25.05.2022 | TR | 25.05.2022 | BG | 25.08.2022 | NO | 25.08.2022 | GR | 26.08.2022 | IS | 25.09.2022 | PT | 26.09.2022 | IE | 22.12.2022 | LU | 22.12.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
CY | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
MK | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
TR | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
IE | 22.12.2022 | ||
LU | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
CY | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MK | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
IE | 22.12.2022 | ||
LU | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
CY | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
IE | 22.12.2022 | ||
LU | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
IE | 22.12.2022 | ||
LU | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
LU | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | DK | 25.05.2022 | |
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 25.05.2022 | |
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | FI | 25.05.2022 | |
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 25.05.2022 | |
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 25.05.2022 | |
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 25.05.2022 | |
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5568266 (CIZA JEAN-CHARLES [FR], et al) [Y] 10-14 * abstract *; | [IAY]WO2004081653 (SCALAR CORP [JP], et al) [I] 1-9,21-26 * paragraphs [0147] , [ 153] - [0156]; figures 3, 11, 12 * [A] 15-20 [Y] 10-14; | [A]DE102004033585 (AXANA MUELLER SUSI [DE], et al) [A] 4-9 * abstract *; | [AD]WO2007111353 (OJI PAPER CO [JP], et al) [AD] 15-20 * abstract *; | [Y]US2009196496 (KALLA KAREN [US], et al) [Y] 10-14 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0058] *; | [IAY]WO2012058641 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [I] 1-9,21,26 * paragraphs [0059] , [0 60]; figures 1A, 4, 9 * [A] 15-20 [Y] 10-14; | [A]US2014285806 (HAAS ALFRED M [US]) [A] 4-9 * abstract *; | [AD]US2017085761 (SHIN YO SHIK [KR]) [AD] 15-20 * abstract *; | [Y]US2017091941 (ATKINSON DON [US]) [Y] 10-14* paragraph [0042]; figures 4,5 * | by applicant | US824374 | US4523852 | US4853744 | US5963333 | US2002036778 | FR2826856 | US2003169421 | US2004062056 | WO2004081653 | DE102004033585 | WO2007111353 | EP1866637 | WO2012058641 | US2014285806 | US9445749 | US2017085761 | US9749502 | US9906697 | US2018143076 | US10139712 | US2019279400 | - J. MARGUIERAL, Assessing Human Skin Color from Uncalibrated Images, Wiley Periodicals, Inc., (20070000), vol. 17, pages 143 - 151 | - J. MARGUIERAL, Assessing Human Skin Color from Uncalibrated Images | - SUNG DEUK KIM, A Smarthone-Based Automatic Measurement - Method for Colorimetric pH Detection Using a Color Adaptation Algorithm |