EP4019538 - REPROGRAMMING IMMUNE CELLS BY TARGETED INTEGRATION OF ZETA-DEFICIENT CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTOR TRANSGENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Charité - Universitätsmedizin Berlin Charitéplatz 1 10117 Berlin / DE | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGNER, Dimitrios Laurin 13347 Berlin / DE | 02 /
KATH, Jonas Christian 10437 Berlin / DE | 03 /
SCHMÜCK-HENNERESSE, Michael 10247 Berlin / DE | 04 /
VOLK, Hans-Dieter 10117 Berlin / DE | 05 /
REINKE, Petra 10117 Berlin / DE | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 20216649.2 | 22.12.2020 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4019538 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/725, C12N9/22, A61K35/17, A61P35/00, C12N5/0783 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
C07K14/7051 (EP,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,US);
A61K39/464412 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,US);
C12N9/22 (EP);
C07K2317/622 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C07K2319/03 (EP,US);
C07K2319/33 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMPROGRAMMIERUNG VON IMMUNZELLEN DURCH GEZIELTE INTEGRATION VON ZETA-DEFIZITÄREN CHIMÄREN ANTIGEN-REZEPTOR-TRANSGENEN | [2022/26] | English: | REPROGRAMMING IMMUNE CELLS BY TARGETED INTEGRATION OF ZETA-DEFICIENT CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTOR TRANSGENES | [2022/26] | French: | REPROGRAMMATION DE CELLULES IMMUNITAIRES PAR UNE INTÉGRATION CIBLÉE DE TRANSGÈNES DE RÉCEPTEUR D'ANTIGÈNE CHIMÉRIQUE DÉFICIENT EN ZÊTA | [2022/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/23] | 24.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2017180989 (MEMORIAL SLOAN KETTERING CANCER CENTER [US]); | [A]WO2019195492 (JUNO THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2020223571 (JUNO THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) | by applicant | US5858358 | US5883223 | US6352694 | US6489458 | US6534055 | US6692736 | US6692964 | US6797514 | US6867041 | US6887466 | US6905680 | US6905681 | US6905874 | US2006121005 | US7067318 | US7144575 | US7172869 | US7175843 | US7232566 | US9228180 | WO2017080989 |