EP4021096 - LINK MANAGEMENT IN A METER READING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kamstrup A/S Industrivej 28 Stilling 8660 Skanderborg / DK | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hald, Flemming 8660 Skanderborg / DK | 02 /
Hofni, Jeppe 8660 Skanderborg / DK | 03 /
Kielgast, Mathias Rønholt 8660 Skanderborg / DK | 04 /
Markussen, Torben 8660 Skanderborg / DK | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Hemmer Lindfeld Frese Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/26] | Patentanwälte Vollmann Hemmer Lindfeld Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 20217053.6 | 23.12.2020 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4021096 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, // H04W52/44, H04W4/48 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
H04W52/44 (EP);
H04Q9/00 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0046 (US);
H04B17/309 (EP,CN);
H04B17/336 (CN);
H04L5/0053 (US);
H04W4/38 (EP,CN);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/21 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/26] | H04W52/44, H04W4/38, H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] |
Former [2022/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LINK MANAGEMENT IN EINEM MESSGERÄTELESESYSTEM | [2022/30] | English: | LINK MANAGEMENT IN A METER READING SYSTEM | [2022/26] | French: | GESTION DES LIENS DANS UN SYSTÈME DE LECTURE DE COMPTEURS | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/26] | LINK MANAGEMENT IN ENINEM MESSGERÄTELESESYSTEME | ||
Former [2022/26] | GESTION DES LIENS DANS DANS UN SYSTÈME DE LECTURE DE COMPTEURS | Examination procedure | 25.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 25.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015178937 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 7, line 28 - page 10, line 10; figure 6 *; | [A]US2019319823 (AKKARAKARAN SONY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0081]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0149]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0281] - paragraph [0284]; figure 17 *; | [A]KR20200107020 (KYUNGPOOK NAT UNIV IND ACADEMIC COOP FOUND [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0014] *; | [A]EP3742656 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0084]; figures 5-7 *; | [A] - In No Sornin ET AL, "?2015 LoRa(TM) Alliance", SPECIAL OR 25 EXEMPLARY, INCIDENTIAL, PUNITIVE OR CONSEQUENTIAL DAMAGES OF ANY KIND, IN CONTRACT OR 26 IN TORT, IN CONNECTION WITH THIS DOCUMENT OR THE INFORMATION CONTAINED HEREIN, EVEN IF, (20150131), pages 1 - 82, URL: https://www.lora-alliance.org/portals/0/specs/LoRaWAN Specification 1R0.pdf, (20170428), XP055368264 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |