EP3852207 - ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING A CONNECTOR AND A WALL PART TO WHICH THE CONNECTOR IS FIXED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/29] | CONNECTOR | ||
[2021/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yazaki Corporation 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8333 / JP | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKINO, Tetsuya c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 206-1, Nunohikihara Makinohara-shi, Shizuoka 421-0407 / JP | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 20217559.2 | 29.12.2020 | [2021/29] | Priority number, date | JP20200004221 | 15.01.2020 Original published format: JP 2020004221 | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3852207 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3852207 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/74, H01R13/506, H01R13/52, H01R13/631 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
H01R13/748 (EP);
H01R13/502 (CN);
H01R13/521 (US);
H01R13/506 (EP);
H01R13/512 (US);
H01R13/518 (US);
H01R13/52 (CN);
H01R13/5202 (EP);
H01R13/6315 (EP,US);
H01R13/74 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG AUS EINEM STECKVERBINDER UND EINEM WANDTEIL, AN DEM DER STECKVERBINDER BEFESTIGT WIRD | [2021/48] | English: | ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING A CONNECTOR AND A WALL PART TO WHICH THE CONNECTOR IS FIXED | [2021/48] | French: | AGENCEMENT COMPRENANT UN CONNECTEUR ET UNE PARTIE DE PAROI AUQUELLE LE CONNECTEUR EST FIXE | [2021/48] |
Former [2021/29] | VERBINDER | ||
Former [2021/29] | CONNECTOR | ||
Former [2021/29] | CONNECTEUR | Examination procedure | 29.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 11.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 09.02.2022 | AT | 09.02.2022 | CY | 09.02.2022 | CZ | 09.02.2022 | DK | 09.02.2022 | EE | 09.02.2022 | ES | 09.02.2022 | FI | 09.02.2022 | HR | 09.02.2022 | IT | 09.02.2022 | LT | 09.02.2022 | LV | 09.02.2022 | MC | 09.02.2022 | MK | 09.02.2022 | NL | 09.02.2022 | PL | 09.02.2022 | RO | 09.02.2022 | RS | 09.02.2022 | SE | 09.02.2022 | SK | 09.02.2022 | SM | 09.02.2022 | BG | 09.05.2022 | NO | 09.05.2022 | GR | 10.05.2022 | IS | 09.06.2022 | PT | 09.06.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MK | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 09.02.2022 | |
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 09.02.2022 | |
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
NL | 09.02.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 09.02.2022 | |
NO | 09.05.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013094774 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * figure 7; claim 1 *; | [A]EP2882045 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7* paragraph [0030]; figure 7 *; | [A]US2019237899 (MAKINO KENJI [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0047]; figure 4 *; | [A]WO2019193992 (AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2015011946 |