EP3845160 - ELECTROSURGICAL INSTRUMENT WITH ELECTRODES BIASING SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon LLC 475 Street C, Suite 401 Los Frailes Industrial Park 00969 Guaynabo / PR | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHELTON, Frederick E., IV 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 02 /
FIEBIG, Kevin M. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 03 /
ARONHALT, Taylor W. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 04 /
MESSERLY, Jeffrey D. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 05 /
ZEINER, Mark S. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 06 /
WORTHINGTON, Sarah A. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 07 /
MORGAN, Joshua P. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 08 /
MORGAN, Nicholas M. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 09 /
MUMAW, Daniel J. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 10 /
ECKERT, Chad E. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2023/51] |
Former [2021/27] | 01 /
SHELTON, Frederick E., IV 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | ||
02 /
FIEBIG, Kevin M. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | |||
03 /
ARONHALT, Taylor W. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | |||
04 /
MESSERLY, Jeffrey D. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | |||
05 /
ZEINER, Mark S. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | |||
06 /
WORTHINGTON, Sarah W. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | |||
07 /
MORGAN, Joshua P. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | |||
08 /
MORGAN, Nicholas M. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | |||
09 /
MUMAW, Daniel J. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | |||
10 /
ECKERT, Chad E. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/51] |
Former [2021/27] | Bettridge, Paul Sebastian Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 20217621.0 | 29.12.2020 | [2021/27] | Priority number, date | US201962955299P | 30.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962955299 P | US202016885851 | 28.05.2020 Original published format: US202016885851 | [2021/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3845160 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3845160 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/29, A61B18/14 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
A61B17/29 (EP);
A61B18/1445 (EP,US);
A61B17/320092 (EP,US);
A61B17/3468 (EP,US);
A61B18/1206 (EP,US);
A61B18/14 (EP);
A61B18/1442 (US);
G06F3/016 (EP);
H02J7/0063 (EP);
H02J7/0068 (US);
H05K1/0283 (EP);
A61B17/072 (EP);
A61B18/16 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00017 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00026 (EP);
A61B2017/00075 (EP);
A61B2017/00115 (EP);
A61B2017/00221 (EP);
A61B2017/00323 (EP);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00734 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2927 (EP);
A61B2017/2929 (EP);
A61B2017/320074 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320094 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00077 (US);
A61B2018/00083 (US);
A61B2018/00107 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00119 (EP);
A61B2018/00125 (EP);
A61B2018/00148 (US);
A61B2018/00202 (EP);
A61B2018/00208 (US);
A61B2018/00345 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00589 (EP);
A61B2018/00595 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00601 (EP);
A61B2018/00607 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00613 (EP);
A61B2018/00619 (EP);
A61B2018/0063 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00642 (EP);
A61B2018/00666 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00827 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00875 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00892 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00982 (EP);
A61B2018/00994 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1226 (EP);
A61B2018/124 (EP);
A61B2018/1246 (EP);
A61B2018/1253 (EP,US);
A61B2018/126 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1273 (EP);
A61B2018/1286 (EP);
A61B2018/142 (US);
A61B2018/144 (EP);
A61B2018/1465 (EP);
A61B2018/1467 (EP,US);
A61B2018/147 (US);
A61B2034/305 (EP);
A61B2090/064 (EP);
A61B2090/065 (EP);
A61B2090/066 (EP);
A61B2562/164 (US);
A61B2562/166 (US);
A61N1/327 (EP);
H02J2310/23 (EP);
H02J7/0047 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] |
Former [2021/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENT MIT ELEKTRODENVORSPANNUNGSUNTERSTÜTZUNG | [2021/27] | English: | ELECTROSURGICAL INSTRUMENT WITH ELECTRODES BIASING SUPPORT | [2021/27] | French: | INSTRUMENT ÉLECTROCHIRURGICAL DOTÉ D'UN SUPPORT DE POLARISATION D'ÉLECTRODES | [2021/27] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 14.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 22.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 22.08.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 22.08.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.08.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 29.11.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 29.11.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.12.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004143263 (SCHECHTER DAVID A [US], et al); | [A]US2014276731 (VOEGELE AARON C [US], et al); | [A]WO2019006068 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL OPERATIONS [US]) | by applicant | US2017086914 | US2019104919 | US2019201136 | US2019206569 | US2019201137 | US2019206562 | US2019200981 | US2019208641 | US2019201594 | US2019201045 | US2019201046 | US2019201047 | US2019206563 | US2019206564 | US2019200998 | US19940629552 | US19920629552 | US20060629553 | US20070162094 |