EP4024140 - POWER MANAGEMENT METHOD FOR A SOLAR WATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Swatch Group Research and Development Ltd Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMBODEN, Matthias 2072 St-Blaise / CH | 02 /
BORN, Jean-Jacques 1110 Morges / CH | 03 /
HÄMMERLI, Alexandre 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 04 /
PARATTE, Lionel 2074 Marin-Epagnier / CH | 05 /
GERMIQUET, Christophe 2515 Prêles / CH | 06 /
GUEISSAZ, François 2036 Cormondrèche / CH | 07 /
WILLEMIN, michel 2515 Prêles / CH | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | ICB SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital, 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20217683.0 | 29.12.2020 | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024140 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G04C10/02, G04C1/06 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
G04C10/02 (EP,CN,US);
H02J9/06 (CN);
H02J7/0063 (US);
G04C1/067 (EP);
G04C10/00 (CN);
G04G19/00 (CN);
G04G19/10 (CN);
H02J7/345 (US);
H02P8/02 (US);
H02S99/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] |
Former [2022/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE SOLARUHR | [2022/27] | English: | POWER MANAGEMENT METHOD FOR A SOLAR WATCH | [2022/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE PUISSANCE POUR UNE MONTRE SOLAIRE | [2022/27] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 09.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US4901295 (TAGUEZOUT DAHO [CH], et al); | [A]US2012057436 (SAKUMOTO KAZUMI [JP], et al); | [A]US2012057435 (HONMURA KEISHI [JP], et al); | [XAI]DE102016211503 (INNOVARTIS GMBH [DE]) |