EP3829162 - PAIRING DEVICES OF A CONFERENCING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring, TX 77389 / US | [2023/14] |
Former [2021/22] | For all designated states Polycom, Inc. 6001 America Center Drive San Jose, CA 95002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chu, Peter L. 7 Hadley Road Lexington, MA Massachusetts 02420 / US | 02 /
Liu, Yibo 18 Harvest Road Reading, MA Massachusetts 01867 / US | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2024/19] |
Former [2021/22] | Käck, Stefan, et al Kahler Käck Mollekopf Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | Application number, filing date | 20217695.4 | 25.10.2012 | [2021/22] | Priority number, date | US201113282633 | 27.10.2011 Original published format: US201113282633 | [2021/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3829162 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3829162 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/15, H04N21/41, H04N21/4363, H04N21/4788, H04N7/14 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
H04N7/142 (EP,US);
H04N21/4126 (EP);
H04N21/43637 (EP);
H04N21/4788 (EP);
H04N7/147 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] |
Former [2021/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kompensierung für unterschiedliche Audiotakte zwischen Vorrichtungen mit Ultraschallbake | [2023/47] | English: | PAIRING DEVICES OF A CONFERENCING SYSTEM | [2021/22] | French: | Compensation d'horloges audio différentes entre des dispositifs utilisant des balises à ultrasons | [2023/47] |
Former [2021/22] | KOMPENSIERUNG FÜR UNTERSCHIEDLICHE AUDIOTAKTE ZWISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN MIT ULTRASCHALLBAKE | ||
Former [2021/22] | COMPENSATION D'HORLOGES AUDIO DIFFÉRENTES ENTRE DES DISPOSITIFS UTILISANT DES BALISES À ULTRASONS | Examination procedure | 25.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 02.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12190019.5 / EP2587800 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP1578129 (MARCONI INTELLECTUAL PTY [US]) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0280] - paragraph [0281] *[A] 1-6,8,9; | [YA]US2010053169 (COOK PERRY R [US]) [Y] 1,3-6,8,9 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0028] * [A] 2,7; | [YA]US2010188473 (KING KEITH C [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-9 * paragraph [0035]; figures 3A, 4A * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033]; figure 2A * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0023]; figure 1 * [A] 2 | by applicant | US2008095401 | US20070872303 |