EP3848662 - HEAT EXCHANGER FIN AND MANUFACTURING MEHTOD OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cooler Master Co., Ltd. 6F. No. 398, Xinhu 1st Rd. Neihu Dist. Taipei City 114065 / TW | [2022/35] |
Former [2021/28] | For all designated states Cooler Master Co., Ltd. 9 F., No. 778-1, Zhongzheng Rd. Zhonghe Dist. New Taipei City 23586 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin, Chia-yu Cooler Master Co., Ltd. 9F., No. 778-1, Zhongzheng Rd., Zhonghe Dist. 23586 New Taipei City / TW | 02 /
Cheng, Shan-yin Cooler Master Co., Ltd. 9F., No. 778-1, Zhongzheng Rd., Zhonghe Dist. 23586 New Taipei City / TW | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/28] | Application number, filing date | 20217804.2 | 30.12.2020 | [2021/28] | Priority number, date | TW20200101118 | 13.01.2020 Original published format: TW 109101118 | US202062970731P | 06.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062970731 P | [2021/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848662 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3848662 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F28D15/02, F28D21/00, F28F3/06, F28F3/14, H01L23/367, H01L23/427 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
F28D15/0233 (EP);
F28D15/0266 (CN);
F28D15/0275 (EP);
F28D15/0283 (EP);
F28F3/06 (EP);
F28F3/14 (EP);
H01L23/3672 (EP);
H01L23/427 (EP);
F28D2021/0029 (EP);
F28F2215/06 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/28] | F28D15/02, F28D21/00, F28F3/06, F28F3/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] |
Former [2021/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHRIPPE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/28] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER FIN AND MANUFACTURING MEHTOD OF THE SAME | [2021/28] | French: | AILETTE D'ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2021/28] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 06.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 16.11.2022 | AT | 16.11.2022 | CY | 16.11.2022 | CZ | 16.11.2022 | DK | 16.11.2022 | EE | 16.11.2022 | ES | 16.11.2022 | HR | 16.11.2022 | IT | 16.11.2022 | LT | 16.11.2022 | LV | 16.11.2022 | MC | 16.11.2022 | MK | 16.11.2022 | NL | 16.11.2022 | PL | 16.11.2022 | RO | 16.11.2022 | RS | 16.11.2022 | SI | 16.11.2022 | SK | 16.11.2022 | SM | 16.11.2022 | IE | 30.12.2022 | LU | 30.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | NO | 16.02.2023 | GR | 17.02.2023 | IS | 16.03.2023 | PT | 16.03.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CY | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
IT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MK | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
IE | 30.12.2022 | ||
LU | 30.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CY | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
IT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
IE | 30.12.2022 | ||
LU | 30.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CY | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
IE | 30.12.2022 | ||
LU | 30.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
IE | 30.12.2022 | ||
LU | 30.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
IE | 30.12.2022 | ||
LU | 30.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
IE | 30.12.2022 | ||
LU | 30.12.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 30.12.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
AT | 16.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 16.11.2022 | |
NO | 16.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE20216065U (LIAU IAN FU [TW]) [Y] 1-18 * paragraphs [0020] - [0034]; figures 1-10 *; | [Y]EP2677261 (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-18 * paragraphs [0019] , [0 38] - [0046]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2018308780 (TONG AIXING [CN], et al) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [X]CN109341401 (CHANGZHOU CHANGFA REFRIGERATION TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0036] - [0061]; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP3550947 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 1-18 * paragraphs [0033] - [0036]; figures 1-6 * |