Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.10.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
25.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.07.2023 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
24.03.2023 | First examination report | |
23.03.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
27.07.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
17.12.2021 | Publication of search report | published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] |
17.12.2021 | Change - classification | published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] |
17.12.2021 | Change - classification | published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] |
23.07.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
23.07.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.01.2021 | Change - representative | |
01.01.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |