EP3885589 - BLIND RIVET INSERT, A COMPONENT WITH AN INSTALLED BLIND RIVET INSERT AND METHOD FOR INSTALLING SUCH A BLIND RIVET INSERT IN A COMPONENT OPENING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bollhoff Otalu S.A. ZI de l'Albanne Rue Archimède 73490 La Ravoire / FR | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROUSSEAUX, Philippe 104 allée de l espinier 73190 Saint Baldoph / FR | 02 /
PERROUD, Norbert Chemin de Bellevarde 73190 Curienne / FR | 03 /
BILLIEMAZ, Bastien 19 rue des Moines 38118 Surbaix / FR | 04 /
FRISON, Jean-Louis La maisonette 73220 Randens / FR | 05 /
BERLIRE, Emmanuelle 251 rue Joseph Dénarié 73190 Challes Les Eaux / FR | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | HWP Intellectual Property Ridlerstraße 35 80339 München / DE | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 20290032.0 | 25.03.2020 | [2021/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3885589 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3885589 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16B19/10, F16B37/06 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
F16B37/067 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F16B19/10 (KR,US);
F16B33/004 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Title | German: | BLINDNIETEINSATZ, BAUTEIL MIT EINGEBAUTEM BLINDNIETEINSATZ UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINBAU EINES SOLCHEN BLINDNIETEINSATZES IN EINE BAUTEILÖFFNUNG | [2021/39] | English: | BLIND RIVET INSERT, A COMPONENT WITH AN INSTALLED BLIND RIVET INSERT AND METHOD FOR INSTALLING SUCH A BLIND RIVET INSERT IN A COMPONENT OPENING | [2021/39] | French: | INSERT DE RIVET AVEUGLE, COMPOSANT DOTÉ D'UN INSERT INSTALLÉ RIVET AVEUGLE ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSTALLATION D'UN TEL INSERT DE RIVET AVEUGLE DANS UNE OUVERTURE DE COMPOSANT | [2021/39] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 12.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 04.05.2022 | AT | 04.05.2022 | DK | 04.05.2022 | EE | 04.05.2022 | FI | 04.05.2022 | HR | 04.05.2022 | LT | 04.05.2022 | LV | 04.05.2022 | MC | 04.05.2022 | NL | 04.05.2022 | RO | 04.05.2022 | RS | 04.05.2022 | SE | 04.05.2022 | SK | 04.05.2022 | SM | 04.05.2022 | BG | 04.08.2022 | NO | 04.08.2022 | GR | 05.08.2022 | IS | 04.09.2022 | [2023/48] |
Former [2023/17] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1557577 (NEWFREY LLC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]CN202140399U (WUXI ANSHIDA HARDWARE CO LTD) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP3366932 (BOLLHOFF OTALU SA [FR]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP3369932 |