EP3876034 - CURABLE COMPOSITION COMPRISING A PHOTOINITIATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKEMA FRANCE 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLENDERLEITH, Richard c/o Lambson Limited Clifford House York Road Wetherby, West Yorkshire LS22 7NS / GB | 02 /
KLANG, Jeffrey c/o Arkema Inc. 900 First Avenue Bldg. 4-2 King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Arkema Patent Arkema France DRD-DPI 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 20305229.5 | 04.03.2020 | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3876034 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/00, G03F7/028, G03F7/038 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
G03F7/0037 (EP,IL,KR);
G03F7/004 (KR);
C08F2/50 (KR,US);
A61K8/8152 (US);
A61Q3/02 (US);
B33Y70/00 (US);
C08F222/104 (US);
C08F222/22 (US);
G03F7/028 (EP,IL);
G03F7/029 (KR,US);
G03F7/038 (EP,IL);
B29C2035/0827 (US);
B29C2035/0877 (US);
B29C35/0805 (US);
B29C35/0866 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÄRTBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM PHOTOINITIATOR | [2021/36] | English: | CURABLE COMPOSITION COMPRISING A PHOTOINITIATOR | [2021/36] | French: | COMPOSITION DURCISSABLE COMPRENANT UN PHOTO-INITIATEUR | [2021/36] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/34] | 05.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2017135388 (SANEI KAGAKU KK); | [Y]WO2018106531 (ARKEMA INC [US]); | [Y]WO2020001835 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR]) | by applicant | WO2014016567 | WO2014126830 | WO2014126834 | WO2014126837 | US2017260418 |