EP3929140 - METHOD FOR CORRELATING POSITION AND PROFILE MEASUREMENTS FOR A HOISTING APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35 Rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2023/31] |
Former [2021/52] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35 Rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BODIN, Yannick 59930 Lachapelle d'Armentières / FR | 02 /
GAUDRAS, Aurélien 13870 Rognonas / FR | 03 /
BLONDEL, Charles 38210 Cras / FR | 04 /
CARVALHO, Jean-François 27930 Miserey / FR | [2021/52] | Representative(s) | Schneider Electric Service Propriété Industrielle 35, rue Joseph Monier CS 30323 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [2023/31] |
Former [2021/52] | van Buul, Bastiaan Richard Marinus, et al Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service de la Propriété Industrielle 35 rue Joseph Monier CS30323 92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 20305680.9 | 22.06.2020 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3929140 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3929140 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B66C13/08, B66C13/46, G01S7/497, G01S17/08, G01S17/42, G01S17/86, G01S17/88, B66C13/18 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
B66C13/46 (EP,BR,CN);
B66C13/16 (CN);
G01S17/88 (EP,BR,US);
B66C13/08 (EP);
B66C13/18 (EP,BR);
B66C13/48 (CN);
G01B11/00 (CN);
G01B11/24 (CN);
G01S17/08 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | B66C13/18, B66C15/00, G01S17/89, B66C17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] |
Former [2021/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM KORRELIEREN VON POSITIONS- UND PROFILMESSUNGEN FÜR EINE HEBEVORRICHTUNG | [2021/52] | English: | METHOD FOR CORRELATING POSITION AND PROFILE MEASUREMENTS FOR A HOISTING APPLIANCE | [2021/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CORRÉLATION DE MESURES DE POSITION ET DE PROFIL POUR UN APPAREIL DE LEVAGE | [2021/52] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 21.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2023 | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US7787105 (HIPP JOHANN [DE]) [Y] 3,4 * column 7, line 41 - column 8, line 28; figure - * [A] 2,5; | [XY]WO2013175075 (KONECRANES PLC [FI]) [X] 1,6-10 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0044]; figure - * [Y] 3,4; | [A]EP3553460 (TADANO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* abstract * |