Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3973999 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3973999



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 74
06.12.2022 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
06.12.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.11.2022 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
26.10.2022 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
04.04.2022 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
02.03.2022 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
16.03.2021 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.03.2021 European search opinion Search / examination 1
16.03.2021 European search report Search / examination 2
16.03.2021 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
26.01.2021 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.01.2021 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.01.2021 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.01.2021 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.01.2021 Acknowledgement of receipt from National Office - R35(4) Search / examination 2
28.09.2020 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.09.2020 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
28.09.2020 Claims Search / examination 2
28.09.2020 Sequence listing Search / examination 0
28.09.2020 Description Search / examination 26
28.09.2020 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
28.09.2020 Drawings Search / examination 16
28.09.2020 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5