EP4005399 - EDIBLE COATING COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING PRECIPITATED CALCIUM CARBONATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ImerTech SAS 43 Quai de Grenelle 75015 Paris / FR | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pagis, Laure 31500 Toulouse / FR | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Bürkleinstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20306459.7 | 27.11.2020 | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4005399 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A23L5/42, A23P20/10, A61K9/28, C09D7/61 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
A23L5/42 (EP);
A23L29/015 (US);
A23L29/262 (US);
A23P20/10 (EP);
A23P20/105 (EP,US);
A61K9/2813 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] |
Former [2022/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ESSBARE BESCHICHTIGUNGEN ENTHALTEND GREFÄLLTES CALCIUMCARBONAT | [2022/22] | English: | EDIBLE COATING COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING PRECIPITATED CALCIUM CARBONATE | [2022/22] | French: | ENROBAGES COMESTIBLES COMPRENANT DU CARBONATE DE CALCIUM PRÉCIPITÉ | [2022/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 30.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0344984 (PFIZER [US]) [X] 1,4-7 * claims 1, 4 *; | [XI]WO9951691 (ECC INT INC [US]) [X] 1,4-7 * page 17, line 7 - page 18, line 15; claims 11-15 * [I] 8,9,13; | [I]EP3124436 (OMYA INT AG [CH]) [I] 1-15 * page 2, paragraphs [0002], [0011]; claims 8, 17 *; | [XI]WO2019241478 (WRIGLEY W M JUN CO [US]) [X] 8-15 * page 10, line 1 - page 19, line 9; example 2; claim - * [I] 1-7; | [A] - Anonymous, "SPECIALITY MINERALS INC. , a technical article", ViCALity Medium, (20130101), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://www.mineralstech.com/docs/default-source/company/vicality-medium.pdf?stvrsn=2000b3e2_2, (20201222), XP055762118 [A] 1-15 * page 1, column r, paragraph l - page 2, column l, paragraph Typical Physical Properties * | [A] - Specialty Minerals, "ViCALity Light", (20110101), URL: https://www.brenntag.com/media/documents/bsi/product-data-sheets/life-science/smi___cal_carb___ls/vicality_light_pds.pdf, (20210330), XP055791306 [A] 1-15 * page 1, column r, paragraph l - page 2, column l, paragraph Typical Physical Properties * | by applicant | - "Paper Coating Pigments", TAPPI Monograph, no. 30, pages 34 - 35 |