EP4019949 - METHODS AND SYSTEM FOR MATERIALS CHARACTERIZATION USING MULTIPLE INSTRUMENTS AND DATA FUSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INEL S.A.S 71 rue d'Orléans 45410 Artenay / FR | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EL MENDILI, Anas 45410 ARTENAY / FR | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Parlett, Peter Michael Thermo Fisher Scientific Stafford House 1 Boundary Park Hemel Hempstead, Hertfordshire HP2 7GE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/26] | Parlett, Peter Michael Intellectual Property Department Thermo Fisher Scientific (Bremen) GmbH Hanna-Kunath-Strasse 11 28199 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 20306696.4 | 24.12.2020 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4019949 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N22/00, G06F17/16 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
G06F17/16 (EP);
G01N35/00871 (US);
G01N2035/00188 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] |
Former [2022/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG VON MATERIALIEN UNTER VERWENDUNG MEHRERER INSTRUMENTE UND DATENFUSION | [2022/26] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEM FOR MATERIALS CHARACTERIZATION USING MULTIPLE INSTRUMENTS AND DATA FUSION | [2022/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈME DE CARACTÉRISATION DE MATÉRIAUX À L'AIDE DE PLUSIEURS INSTRUMENTS ET DE LA FUSION DE DONNÉES | [2022/26] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 02.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - Le Guen M ET AL, "Increasing exploration efficiency with SOLSA Expert System", (20200918), URL: https://www.earthdoc.org/docserver/fulltext/2214-4609/2020/mineral-exploration-symposium/200628_EAGE_abstract_SOLSA_Expert_System-24-161-Le_Guen-Monique.pdf?expires=1622720875&id=id&accname=guest&checksum=D6EEE4B244671053AD398849B1A8A758, (20210603), XP055810317 [I] 1-13 * the whole document * | [I] - Capar Laure ET AL, "Presentation - Determination of spectra characteristics of laterite drill-core for "on line-on site" real-time automated mineralogy detection", doi:10.1109/IGARSS.2017.8127997, ISBN 978-1-5090-4951-6, (20170723), pages 4485 - 4488, URL: https://4d8xuv2577wggnmowfwzehpo-wpengine.netdna-ssl.com/wp-content/uploads/2017/hyperspectral_igarss_sessions/Paper-1562-IGARSS2017-VFinal.pdf, (20210604), XP055810432 [I] 1-13 * pages 5-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IGARSS.2017.8127997 | [A] - GUO YONGBO ET AL, "Multi Body Dynamic Equations of Belt Conveyor and the Reasonable Starting Mode", SYMMETRY, (20200910), vol. 12, no. 9, doi:10.3390/sym12091489, page 1489, XP055810450 [A] 1-13 * fig. 1, eq. 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/sym12091489 | by applicant | US8630314 | US8736817 | US9117133 | US9618651 | US9746559 | US9976852 | US10373339 | WO2019213012 | - "Introduction: Ways and Means to Deal with Data from Multiple Sources", COCCHI, MARINA, Data Handling in Science and Technology, Elsevier, (20190000), vol. 31, pages 1 - 26 | - LEUE, MARTINCARSTEN HOFFMANNWILFRIED HIEROLDMICHAEL SOMMER, "In-situ multi-sensor characterization of soil cores along an erosion-deposition gradient", Catena, (20190000), vol. 182, doi:10.1016/j.catena.2019.104140, page 104140, XP085756358 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.catena.2019.104140 | - FAN, SHUXIANGCHANGYING LIWENQIAN HUANGLIPING CHEN, "Data fusion of two hyperspectral imaging systems with complementary spectral sensing ranges for blueberry bruising detection", Sensors, (20180000), vol. 18, no. 12, page 4463 | - "Serial sectioning methods for generating 3D characterization data of grain-and precipitate-scale microstructures", UCHIC, MICHAEL D, Computational methods for microstructure-property relationships, Springer, (20110000), pages 31 - 52 | - P. B. DAVENPORT, "Rotations about nonorthogonal axes", AIAA Journal, (19730000), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 853 - 857 |